EP2015581 - DYNAMIC IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, PROGRAM FOR THE DYNAMIC IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, RECORDING MEDIUM CONTAINING THE PROGRAM FOR THE DYNAMIC IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, DYNAMIC IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGURA, Takayuki SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
SHIGEMOTO, Daijou SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07739227.2 | 14.03.2007 | [2009/03] | WO2007JP55784 | Priority number, date | JP20060128093 | 02.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006128093 | [2009/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007129508 | Date: | 15.11.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2015581 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26, H03M7/40 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
H04N19/423 (EP,US);
H04N19/13 (KR);
H04N19/42 (KR);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N19/70 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/91 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/03] | H04N7/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHES BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, PROGRAMM FÜR DAS DYNAMISCHE BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, DAS PROGRAMM FÜR DAS DYNAMISCHE BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFARHEN ENTHALTENDES AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM, EINRICHTUNG ZUR DYNAMISCHEN BILDVERARBEITUNG | [2009/03] | English: | DYNAMIC IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, PROGRAM FOR THE DYNAMIC IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, RECORDING MEDIUM CONTAINING THE PROGRAM FOR THE DYNAMIC IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, DYNAMIC IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE | [2009/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DYNAMIQUE D'IMAGE, LOGICIEL A CET EFFET, SUPPORT INFORMATIQUE CONTENANT CE LOGICIEL | [2009/03] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2008 | Translation filed | 29.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 27.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/51] | 31.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.02.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - OSORIO R R ET AL, "Arithmetic coding architecture for H.264/AVC CABAC compression system", DIGITAL SYSTEM DESIGN, 2004. DSD 2004. EUROMICRO SYMPOSIUM ON RENNES, FRANCE AUG. 31 - SEPT. 3, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040831), doi:10.1109/DSD.2004.1333259, ISBN 978-0-7695-2203-6, pages 62 - 69, XP010723482 [X] 1-4,7-9 * Section 4 "Context management optimization";; figures 8,9; table 1 * [I] 5,6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DSD.2004.1333259 | [XI] - WEI YU ET AL, "A High Performance CABAC Decoding Architecture", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20051101), vol. 51, no. 4, doi:10.1109/TCE.2005.1561867, ISSN 0098-3063, pages 1352 - 1359, XP002576043 [X] 1-4,7-9 * Section IV.B "Context maintainance";; figure 1 * [I] 5,6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCE.2005.1561867 | [A] - MARPE D ET AL, "Context-based adaptive binary arithmetic coding in the H.264/AVC video compression standard", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20030701), vol. 13, no. 7, doi:10.1109/TCSVT.2003.815173, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 620 - 636, XP011099255 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2003.815173 | International search | [A]JP2002218474 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2004040261 (NEC MICROSYSTEMS LTD); | [A]JP2005130099 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2005223533 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN); | [A]JP2006054865 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2005130099 | JP2005217871 |