EP2009945 - MOBILE COMMUNICATION TERMINAL, SYNCHRONIZATION JUDGING CIRCUIT USED IN THE MOBILE COMMUNICATION TERMINAL, CONTROL METHOD, AND SYNCHRONIZATION JUDGING CONTROL PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2009/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Kazunori c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo, 108-8001 / JP | [2014/33] |
Former [2009/01] | 01 /
SATOU, Kazunori c/o NEC CORPORATION, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo, 108-8001 / JP | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [2014/40] |
Former [2009/01] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07739884.0 | 27.03.2007 | [2009/01] | WO2007JP56446 | Priority number, date | JP20060101261 | 31.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006101261 | [2009/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007116757 | Date: | 18.10.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2009945 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2009945 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/7075 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
H04B1/70755 (EP,US);
H04B2201/70701 (EP,US);
H04B2201/70709 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/10] | H04W4/00, H04B1/707, H04B7/26, H04L7/00 | ||
Former IPC [2009/01] | H04Q7/38, H04B1/707, H04B7/26, H04L7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/20] |
Former [2009/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSGERÄT, IN DEM MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSGERÄT VERWENDETE SYNCHRONISATIONSBEURTEILUNGSSCHALTUNG, STEUERVERFAHREN UND SYNCHRONISATIONSBEURTEILUNGSSTEUERPROGRAMM | [2009/01] | English: | MOBILE COMMUNICATION TERMINAL, SYNCHRONIZATION JUDGING CIRCUIT USED IN THE MOBILE COMMUNICATION TERMINAL, CONTROL METHOD, AND SYNCHRONIZATION JUDGING CONTROL PROGRAM | [2009/01] | French: | TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE, CIRCUIT D'ÉVALUATION DE SYNCHRONISATION UTILISÉ DANS LE TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE, ET PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE D'ÉVALUATION DE SYNCHRONISATION | [2009/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2008 | Translation filed | 21.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 01.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003103577 (HARADA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-9,11-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0007] , [0009] - [0013] - [0017] , [0021] , [0023] , [0025] , [0027] , [0040] , [0091] , [0095] , [0097] , [0099] , [0102] , [0103] , [0111] * * paragraphs [0125] - [0149] - [0156] , [0163] - [0167] * [I] 4,10,14; | [A]US2004110477 (NISHIMURA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraphs [0126] - [0145]; figure 16 *; | [A]US2005075122 (LINDOFF BENGT [SE], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] - [0026] - [0038] - [0041] * | International search | [A]JPH0918404 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2003169018 (FUJITSU LTD) | by applicant | JP2002101006 | JP2005253055 |