EP2119693 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING 2-ISOPROPENYL-5-METHYL-4-HEXENE-1-YL- 3-METHYL-2-BUTENOATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-8622 / JP | [2012/46] |
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-8622 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UJITA, Katsuji c/o KURARAY CO. LTD. 2-28. Kurashiki-cho Tainai-shi Niigata 959-2691 / JP | 02 /
SAEKI, Keisuke BRIDGESTONE Toranomon-BLDG. 6F 25-2, Toranomon 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0001 / JP | [2012/46] |
Former [2010/02] | 01 /
UJITA, Katsuji KURARAY CO. LTD. 2-28 Kurashiki-cho Tainai-shi Niigata 959-2691 / JP | ||
02 /
SAEKI, Keisuke BRIDGESTONE Toranomon-BLDG. 6F 25-2, Toranomon 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0001 / JP | |||
Former [2009/47] | 01 /
UJITA, Katsuji KURARAY CO. LTD. 2-28 Kurashiki-cho Tainai-shi Niigata 959-2691 / JP | ||
02 /
SAEKI, Keisuke 25-2, Toranomon 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 100-0001 / JP | Representative(s) | Duckworth, Timothy John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2012/49] |
Former [2009/47] | Duckworth, Timothy John J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07740025.7 | 28.03.2007 | [2009/47] | WO2007JP56587 | Priority number, date | JP20060341025 | 19.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006341025 | [2009/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008075468 | Date: | 26.06.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2119693 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2119693 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/14, C07C67/60, C07C69/533 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
C07C67/14 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/14, C07C69/533 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 3-METHYL-2-BUTENSÄURE-2-ISOPROPENYL-5-METHYL-4-HEXEN-1-YLESTER | [2009/47] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING 2-ISOPROPENYL-5-METHYL-4-HEXENE-1-YL- 3-METHYL-2-BUTENOATE | [2009/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DU 3-MÉTHYL-2-BUTÉNOATE DE 2-ISOPROPÉNYL-5-MÉTHYL-4-HEXÈNE-1-YLE | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2009 | Translation filed | 10.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 27.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.03.2007 | AT | 05.12.2012 | BE | 05.12.2012 | CY | 05.12.2012 | CZ | 05.12.2012 | DK | 05.12.2012 | EE | 05.12.2012 | FI | 05.12.2012 | LT | 05.12.2012 | LV | 05.12.2012 | MT | 05.12.2012 | NL | 05.12.2012 | PL | 05.12.2012 | RO | 05.12.2012 | SE | 05.12.2012 | SI | 05.12.2012 | SK | 05.12.2012 | TR | 05.12.2012 | BG | 05.03.2013 | GR | 06.03.2013 | IE | 28.03.2013 | LU | 28.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | IS | 05.04.2013 | PT | 05.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MT | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
TR | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 28.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MT | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 28.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 28.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 05.12.2012 | |
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 05.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1813973 (GIVAUDAN & CIE SA) [A] 1* page 7, line 3-11; * | International search | [A]GB1244187 (GIVAUDAN & CIE SA [CH]); | [A]US3781333 (KAPPELER H, et al); | [A]JPH02129144 (NIPPON PEROXIDE CO LTD); | [A]JP2002187868 (DAICEL CHEM); | [A]JP2003064027 (DAICEL CHEM); | [A]WO2006109570 (KURARAY CO [JP], et al); | [A] - HINKENS D.M. ET AL., "Identificatio and synthesis of the sex pheromone of the vine mealybug, Planococcus ficus", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2001), vol. 42, no. 9, pages 1619 - 1621, XP008110004 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)02347-9 | by applicant | JP2002308815 | - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2001), vol. 42, pages 1619 - 1621 |