EP2019577 - MULTILAYER MODULE WITH CASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 10-1 Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2009/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Koji MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. (A170) Intellectual Property Department 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | [2009/05] | Representative(s) | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/05] | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07740537.1 | 30.03.2007 | [2009/05] | WO2007JP57101 | Priority number, date | JP20060138235 | 17.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006138235 | [2009/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007132599 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2019577 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2019577 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/46, H05K9/00 | [2009/05] | CPC: |
H05K3/403 (EP,US);
H05K3/46 (KR);
H05K3/3405 (EP,US);
H05K9/00 (KR);
H01L2224/16225 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19105 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0919 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10371 (EP,US);
H05K3/0052 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTMODUL MIT GEHÄUSE | [2009/05] | English: | MULTILAYER MODULE WITH CASE | [2009/05] | French: | MODULE MULTICOUCHE AVEC BOITIER | [2009/05] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2008 | Translation filed | 04.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/05] | 23.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.06.2010 | BE | 30.06.2010 | CY | 30.06.2010 | CZ | 30.06.2010 | DK | 30.06.2010 | EE | 30.06.2010 | FI | 30.06.2010 | HU | 30.06.2010 | IT | 30.06.2010 | LT | 30.06.2010 | LV | 30.06.2010 | MT | 30.06.2010 | NL | 30.06.2010 | PL | 30.06.2010 | RO | 30.06.2010 | SE | 30.06.2010 | SI | 30.06.2010 | SK | 30.06.2010 | TR | 30.06.2010 | BG | 30.09.2010 | GR | 01.10.2010 | ES | 11.10.2010 | IS | 30.10.2010 | PT | 02.11.2010 | GB | 30.03.2011 | IE | 30.03.2011 | LU | 30.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
MT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
TR | 30.06.2010 | ||
BG | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
GB | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 30.03.2011 | ||
LU | 30.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
MT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
BG | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
GB | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 30.03.2011 | ||
LU | 30.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
MT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
GB | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 30.03.2011 | ||
LU | 30.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
MT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
GB | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 30.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
MT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH07263892 (SONY CORP); | [A]JPH11238994 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO) | by applicant | JPH06252562 |