EP2008587 - LANCET ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Izumi-Cosmo Company, Limited 3-3, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0005 / JP | [2009/47] |
Former [2009/01] | For all designated states Izumi-Cosmo Company Limited 3-3, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAMURA, Yoritaka c/o IZUMI-COSMO COMPANY, LIMITED TOKYO SECONDARY HEAD OFFICE 1-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0022 / JP | 02 /
ABE, Teruyuki c/o IZUMI-COSMO COMPANY, LIMITED TOKYO SECONDARY HEAD OFFICE; 1-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0022 / JP | 03 /
SEKI, Kazuharu 3-21-28, Ikejiri Setagaya-ku Tokyo 1540001 / JP | [2009/01] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/01] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07740817.7 | 02.04.2007 | [2009/01] | WO2007JP57381 | Priority number, date | JP20060102165 | 03.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006102165 | [2009/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007114423 | Date: | 11.10.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2008587 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/151 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
A61B5/150198 (EP,US);
A61B5/151 (KR);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150412 (EP,US);
A61B5/150519 (EP,US);
A61B5/150549 (EP,US);
A61B5/150618 (EP,US);
A61B5/150717 (EP,US);
A61B5/15113 (EP,US);
A61B5/15117 (EP,US);
A61B5/1513 (EP,US);
A61B5/1519 (EP,US);
A61B5/15194 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LANZETTENANORDNUNG | [2009/01] | English: | LANCET ASSEMBLY | [2009/01] | French: | ENSEMBLE LANCETTE | [2009/01] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2008 | Translation filed | 30.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 30.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 25.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0565970 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7,16,17 * column 7, lines 28-47 * * column 15, lines 14-32 * * figure - * [A] 8-15; | [X]EP1405596 (ARKRAY INC [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,7,16,17 * figures 2,3,18-21 *; | [XA]WO2006004664 (FACET TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [X] 16 * figure - * [A] 1-7,17; | [XA]WO02065910 (OWEN MUMFORD LTD [GB], et al) [X] 16 * figure - * [A] 1-7,17 | International search | [A]WO02056769 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2004290477 (TERUMO CORP); | [AP]WO2006046570 (ARKRAY INC [JP], et al) | by applicant | US5385571 | EP0565970 |