EP2006648 - ROTATION ANGLE DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OIKE, Kouji c/oPanasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-Chrome, Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5400-6270 / JP | 02 /
UEHIRA, Kiyotaka c/oPanasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-Chrome, Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5400-6270 / JP | 03 /
SASANOUCHI Kiyotaka c/oPanasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-Chrome, Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5400-6270 / JP | [2009/09] |
Former [2008/52] | 01 /
OIKE, Kouji c/o Matsushita Elec. Indu. Co., Ltd IPROC IP Dev. Ctr 7F Twin 21 OBP Panas. Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
UEHIRA, Kiyotaka c/o Matsushita Elec. Ind. Co., Ltd IPROC IP Dev. Ctr 7F Twin 21 OBP Panas. Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
03 /
SASANOUCHI, Kiyotaka c/o Matsushita Elec. Ind. Co. Ltd, IPROC IP Dev. Ctr 7F Twin 21 OBP Panas. Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07741241.9 | 09.04.2007 | [2008/52] | WO2007JP57805 | Priority number, date | JP20060107352 | 10.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006107352 | JP20060107353 | 10.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006107353 | [2008/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007119701 | Date: | 25.10.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2006648 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2006648 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01L3/10, G01B7/30, G01D5/20 | [2012/14] | CPC: |
G01L5/221 (EP,US);
G01D5/2086 (EP,US);
G01D5/2093 (EP,US);
G01L3/104 (EP,US);
G01L3/105 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/11] | G01L3/10, G01B7/30 | ||
Former IPC [2008/52] | G01L3/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/22] |
Former [2008/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROTATIONSWINKELMESSER | [2008/52] | English: | ROTATION ANGLE DETECTOR | [2008/52] | French: | DETECTEUR D'ANGLE DE ROTATION | [2008/52] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2008 | Translation filed | 06.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 11.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0216188 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-5 * * page 1, line 13 - page 3, line 23 * * page 4, line 7 - page 9, line 24 * [Y] 6-8; | [Y]EP1225419 (NILES PARTS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 8 * abstract * * figure 1 ** paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0100] *; | [Y]JP2005201712 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 6-8 * figures 1,2 * * abstract * | International search | [X]JP2001091375 (KOYO SEIKO CO); | [Y]JP2002340515 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2005201712 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH11500828 | JPH11194007 |