EP2080951 - BOILER WATER WALL PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dai-Ichi High Frequency Co., Ltd. 1-6-2 Nihonbashi Bakurocho Chuo-ku Tokyo 1030002 / JP | For all designated states Flourshing Enterprise Co., Ltd. 6F-2, N[deg]236, SEC. 2 Fuhsing South TD. Taipei / TW | [2009/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITAI, Kazunari DAI-ICHI HIGH FREQUENCY CO., LTD. 17-8, Tonomachi 2-chome Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-0821 / JP | 02 /
TAKEYA, Akihiro DAI-ICHI HIGH FREQUENCY CO., LTD. 17-8, Tonomachi 2-chome Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-0821 / JP | 03 /
SOCHI, Yoshinobu DAI-ICHI HIGH FREQUENCY CO., LTD. 17-8, Tonomachi 2-chome Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-0821 / JP | 04 /
TANABE, Michio DAI-ICHI HIGH FREQUENCY CO., LTD. 17-8, Tonomachi 2-chome Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-0821 / JP | 05 /
MATSUBARA, Yoichi DAI-ICHI HIGH FREQUENCY CO., LTD. 17-8, Tonomachi 2-chome Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-0821 / JP | [2009/30] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Intes, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07741879.6 | 18.04.2007 | [2009/30] | WO2007JP58443 | Priority number, date | JP20060300962 | 06.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006300962 | [2009/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008056456 | Date: | 15.05.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2080951 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F22B37/10, F22B37/04 | [2009/30] | CPC: |
F22B37/102 (EP,US);
F22B37/10 (KR);
F22B37/04 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2010/20] |
Former [2009/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KESSELWASSERWANDPANEEL | [2009/30] | English: | BOILER WATER WALL PANEL | [2009/30] | French: | PANNEAU MURAL AVEC EAU DE CHAUDIÈRE | [2009/30] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2009 | Translation filed | 31.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 09.06.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.07.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/08] | 07.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE4232880 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 41; figures 3-5; claim - * * abstract *; | [Y]US3585709 (MULLER WERNER, et al) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR1372949 (STEINMUELLER GMBH L & C) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JP2005274022 (DAI ICHI HIGH FREQUENCY CO LTD, et al); | [Y]JPH06193808 (SIEMENS AG); | [Y]JPS54101539 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [Y]JPH0741268U ; | [A]JPH07218172 (SANDEN CORP) | by applicant | JP2000329304 | JP2001004101 | JP2005274022 | JP2005337623 |