EP2052673 - ENDOSCOPIC DEVICE AND ITS PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2009/18] | For all designated states Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAZAKI, Kenji c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP., 43-2 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | 02 /
GONO, Kazuhiro c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP., 43-2 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2017/01] |
Former [2016/41] | 01 /
YAMAZAKI, Kenji c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | ||
02 /
GONO, Kazuhiro c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | |||
Former [2009/18] | 01 /
YAMAZAKI, Kenji c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
02 /
GONO, Kazuhiro c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [2017/46] |
Former [2009/18] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07742106.3 | 20.04.2007 | [2009/18] | WO2007JP58671 | Priority number, date | JP20060223576 | 18.08.2006 Original published format: JP 2006223576 | [2009/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008020499 | Date: | 21.02.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2052673 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2052673 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/04, A61B1/00, A61B1/06, G02B23/24, H04N7/18 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
H04N7/183 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/0646 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/00186 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/04 (KR);
G02B23/24 (EP,KR,US);
G02B26/008 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/555 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/46] |
Former [2009/39] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ENDOSKOPVORRICHTUNG UND AUFBEREITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2009/18] | English: | ENDOSCOPIC DEVICE AND ITS PROCESSING METHOD | [2009/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF ENDOSCOPE ET SON PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT | [2009/18] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2009 | Translation filed | 17.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 17.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 19.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 20.04.2018 | FR | 30.04.2018 | [2019/23] |
Former [2019/13] | GB | 20.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2006061621 (OLYMPUS CORP) [X] 1-16 * figure 1 *; | [E]EP2047792 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [E] 1-16* figure 1 * | International search | [A]JP2002095635 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [X]JP2003093336 (TOSHIBA CORP) | Examination | US2003229270 | by applicant | JP2002095635 | JP2006223576 |