02.10.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] |
25.10.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
25.10.2019 |
Change - inventor |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
22.10.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
21.10.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.10.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.06.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.05.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
10.05.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
04.05.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.05.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.05.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.05.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.10.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.06.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.05.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.07.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.02.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.02.2011 |
First examination report |
|
21.01.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.06.2010 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
25.06.2010 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
13.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.05.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.05.2009 |
Change - designated states |
published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] |
01.05.2009 |
Change - extension states |
published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] |
29.04.2009 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
13.01.2009 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
12.12.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] |
12.12.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] |
18.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.10.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.10.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
17.10.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.11.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|