EP2033878 - RADIATOR CORE SUPPORT STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calsonic Kansei Corporation 5-24-15, Minamidai, Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | [2009/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JYOUTAKI, Noboru c/o Calsonic Kansei Corporation 2-1917 Nisshin-cho Kita-ku Saitama-shi Saitama-ken 331-8501 / JP | 02 /
INOUE, Hiroyuki 5-24-15 Minamidai Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | [2009/29] |
Former [2009/17] | 01 /
JYOUTAKI, Noboru 5-24-15 Minamidai Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | ||
02 /
INOUE, Hiroyuki 5-24-15 Minamidai Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | |||
Former [2009/11] | 01 /
JYOUTAKI, Noboru 5-24-15 Minamidai Nakano-ku Aichi 164-8602 / JP | ||
02 /
INOUE, Hiroyuki 5-24-15 Minamidai Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | Representative(s) | Oxley, Robin John George Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/11] | Oxley, Robin John George Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07742913.2 | 08.05.2007 | [2009/11] | WO2007JP59478 | Priority number, date | JP20060163078 | 13.06.2006 Original published format: JP 2006163078 | [2009/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007145039 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2033878 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/08, B60K11/04 | [2009/11] | CPC: |
B62D25/084 (EP,US);
B62D25/08 (KR);
B60K11/04 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/29] |
Former [2009/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGSTRUKTUR FÜR KÜHLERBLOCK | [2009/11] | English: | RADIATOR CORE SUPPORT STRUCTURE | [2009/11] | French: | SUPPORT POUR FAISCEAU DE RADIATEUR | [2009/11] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2009 | Translation filed | 08.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 14.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/33] | 01.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH0585412 (MAZDA MOTOR); | [A]JP2002321645 (DENSO CORP) | by applicant | JP2002166848 |