EP2013952 - SURFACE-EMISSION LASER ARRAY, OPTICAL SCANNING APPARATUS AND IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2021 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.02.2022 [2022/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2021/08] |
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Shunichi 138-1, Kamibarada, Wataricho Watari-gun, Miyagi 989-2351 / JP | 02 /
ITOH, Akihiro 54, Ohkumakouyaazatakanohashi Wataricho Watari-gun, Miyagi 989-2324 / JP | 03 /
SHOUJI, Hiroyoshi 25, Kamiayashiazakaidou Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 989-3124 / JP | 04 /
HAYASHI, Yoshinori 21-15-422, Shukugawara 4-chome Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 214-0021 / JP | 05 /
ICHII, Daisuke 729-10-203, Okagami, Asao-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 215-0027 / JP | 06 /
HARA, Kei 4-4-20-503, Nagamachi Taihaku-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 982-0011 / JP | 07 /
FUJII, Mitsumi 107, Sahinainakayashiki, Shiwacho Shiwa-gun, Iwate 028-3316 / JP | [2021/08] |
Former [2009/16] | 01 /
SATO, Shunichi 138-1, Kamibarada, Wataricho Watari-gun, Miyagi 989-2351 / JP | ||
02 /
ITOH, Akihiro 54, Ohkumakouyaazatakanohashi Wataricho Watari-gun, Miyagi 989-2324 / JP | |||
03 /
SHOUJI, Hiroyoshi 25, Kamiayashiazakaidou Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 989-3124 / JP | |||
04 /
HAYASHI, Yoshinori 21-15-422, Shukugawara 4-chome Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 214-0021 / JP | |||
05 /
ICHII, Daisuke 729-10-203, Okagami, Asao-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 215-0027 / JP | |||
06 /
HARA, Kei 4-4-20-503, Nagamachi Taihaku-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 982-0011 / JP | |||
07 /
FUJII, Mitsumi 107, Sahinainakayashiki, Shiwacho Shiwa-gun, Iwate 028-3316 / JP | |||
Former [2009/03] | 01 /
SATO, Shunichi 138-1, Kamibarada, Wataricho Watari-gun, Miyagi 989-2351 / JP | ||
02 /
ITOH, Akihiro 54, Ohkumakouyaazatakanohashi Wataricho Watari-gun, Miyagi 989-2324 / JP | |||
03 /
SHOUJI, Hiroyoshi 25, Kamiayashiazakaidou Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 989-3124 / JP | |||
04 /
HAYASHI, Yoshinori 21-15-422, Shukugawara 4-chome Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 214-0021 / JP | |||
05 /
ICHII, Daisuke 729-10-203, Okagami, Asao-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 215-0027 / JP | |||
06 /
HARA, Kei 22-8-410, Ohnodaazashimizu, Taihaku-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 982-0014 / JP | |||
07 /
FUJII, Mitsumi 107, Sahinainakayashiki, Shiwacho Shiwa-gun, Iwate 028-3316 / JP | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2021/08] |
Former [2009/03] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07742998.3 | 27.04.2007 | [2009/03] | WO2007JP59563 | Priority number, date | JP20060126074 | 28.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006126074 | JP20060126076 | 28.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006126076 | JP20070035652 | 16.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007035652 | JP20070057955 | 08.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007057955 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007126159 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2013952 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2013952 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/183, B41J2/44 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
B41J2/45 (EP,US);
H01S5/183 (KR);
B41J2/44 (KR);
B41J2/473 (EP,US);
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
H01S5/423 (EP,US);
G02B26/123 (EP,US);
H01S5/18311 (EP,US);
H01S5/18358 (EP,US);
H01S5/3432 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/03] | H01S5/183 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2021/08] |
Former [2009/32] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2009/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENEMISSIONSLASERARRAY, OPTISCHE ABTASTVORRICHTUNG UND BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2009/03] | English: | SURFACE-EMISSION LASER ARRAY, OPTICAL SCANNING APPARATUS AND IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS | [2009/03] | French: | RESEAU DE LASER A EMISSION EN SURFACE, DISPOSITIF DE BALAYAGE OPTIQUE ET APPAREIL DE FORMATION D'IMAGE | [2009/03] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2007 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 29.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0781662 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,14,15 * column 10, line 28; figure 11 * [A] 7-12 [Y] 4-6; | [XAY]EP0781661 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 7, line 30 - column 8, line 48; figures 8-10 * [A] 5-12 [Y] 4; | [YA]JP2003273456 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP, et al) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * [A] 1-4,7-15; | [YA]EP1411603 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY [JP]) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0039] - [0046] - [0053] - [0058]; figures 2,4-7, 12-17 * [A] 1-3,5-15; | [YA]WO2005062434 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * [A] 1-4,7-15; | EP1710877 [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) | International search | [A]JPH01159269 (PLESSEY OVERSEAS); | [A]JPH0872306 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG); | [X]JPH09200431 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [X]JP2000094745 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [Y]JP2002314191 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) | by applicant | EP0781662 | EP0781661 | JPH09200431 | US5848087 | JPH11340570 | JPH11354888 | JP2001272615 | JP2003273456 | EP1411603 | WO2005062434 | JP2005234510 | JP2005274755 | - IEICE Electronics Society Meeting, (20040000), pages CS-3 - 4 |