EP2023292 - PROCESSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2020/09] |
Former [2015/14] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
Former [2009/07] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAKAYAMA, Yorihiko c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2020/09] |
Former [2009/07] | 01 /
WAKAYAMA, Yorihiko, c/o Panasonic Corp., IPROC IP Dev. Center, 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/09] |
Former [2009/07] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07743133.6 | 11.05.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007JP59698 | Priority number, date | JP20060132164 | 11.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006132164 | [2009/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007132746 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2023292 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2023292 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/00, G06T1/20 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
G06T15/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2020/09] |
Former [2009/24] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2009/07] | English: | PROCESSING DEVICE | [2009/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT | [2009/07] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2008 | Translation filed | 08.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 08.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 12.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2018 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 11.12.2018 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 25.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2019 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 26.05.2020 | FR | 31.05.2020 | [2021/23] |
Former [2021/22] | GB | 26.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA] - MOYA V ET AL, "Shader Performance Analysis on a Modern GPU Architecture", MICROARCHITECTURE, 2005. MICRO-38. PROCEEDINGS. 38TH ANNUAL IEEE/ACM I NTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON BARCELONA, SPAIN 12-16 NOV. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20051112), doi:10.1109/MICRO.2005.30, ISBN 978-0-7695-2440-5, pages 355 - 364, XP010854754 [I] 1,6,9-14 * abstract * * section 3 and page 5: last paragraph * [A] 2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MICRO.2005.30 | [A] - Anonymous, "The GPU - How Xbox 360 Works | HowStuffWorks", (20050605), URL: http://electronics.howstuffworks.com/xbox-three-sixty3.htm, (20160609), XP055279207 [A] 1 * paragraphs contained in pages 3-5 * | [A] - Anonymous, "what is unified shaders? | Beyond3D Forum", (20060101), URL: https://forum.beyond3d.com/threads/what-is-unified-shaders.26043/, (20160602), XP055277527 [A] 1 * post #2 * | International search | [A]JPH11328436 (FUJITSU LTD); | [X]JP2004110330 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN) | by applicant | JPH11328436 |