EP2022843 - CELL SELECTION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu City Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [2015/32] |
Former [2009/07] | For all designated states HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu City Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | ||
For all designated states National University Corporation Hamamatsu University School of Medicine 20-1 Handayama 1 chome Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 431-3192 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRUMA, Teruo@c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho, Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 4358558 / JP | 02 /
IWAI, Hidenao@c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho, Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 4358558 / JP | 03 /
TERAKAWA, Susumu@c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION HAMAMATSU UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF MEDICINE 20-1, Handayama 1-chome Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-3192 / JP | [2016/04] |
Former [2009/07] | 01 /
HIRUMA, Teruo c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho, Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 4358558 / JP | ||
02 /
IWAI, Hidenao c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho, Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 4358558 / JP | |||
03 /
TERAKAWA, Susumu c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION HAMAMATSU UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF MEDICINE 20-1, Handayama 1-chome Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-3192 / JP | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2009/07] | Frost, Alex John Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 07743384.5 | 15.05.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007JP59949 | Priority number, date | JP20060141796 | 22.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006141796 | [2009/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007135896 | Date: | 29.11.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2022843 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2022843 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/36, G01N33/49 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
A61M1/36 (EP,US);
A61M1/3678 (EP,US);
G01N33/491 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/07] | C12M1/34, A61M1/36, G01N33/49 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2016/04] |
Former [2009/24] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZELLSELEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2009/07] | English: | CELL SELECTION APPARATUS | [2009/07] | French: | APPAREIL DE SÉLECTION DE CELLULES | [2009/07] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2008 | Translation filed | 28.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 28.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 23.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0062818 (EDELSON RICHARD LESLIE [US]) [A] 7,8 * abstract ** page 3, line 8 - page 6, line 2 *; | [Y]DE10216744 (FOSS PIERRE [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0052] - [0054] *; | [Y]WO2005108963 (UNIV NANYANG [SG], et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * page 13, line 27 - page 18, line 14 * | International search | [Y]JPH07270302 (TOA MEDICAL ELECTRONICS); | [Y]JP2003250882 (NARUSE KATSUTOSHI); | [Y]JP2005515781 | by applicant | JPS57500995 | JPH0661360 | JPH073419 | US2005105097 | - THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (2004), vol. 351, pages 781 - 791 | - A. HIRAI; H. MONJUSHIRO; H. WATARAI, "Laser-Photophoresis of a Single Droplet in o/w Emulsions", LANGMUIR, (1997), vol. 12, pages 5570 - 5575 | - A. DUNN, J. BIOMED. OPTICS, (1997), vol. 2, pages 262 - 266 | - T. TANAKA ET AL., "Chemokines and tumor invasion/metastasis" section in "Chemokines in tumor progression and metastasis", CANCER SCI., (2005), vol. 96, pages 317 - 322 | - A. MULLER ET AL., "Involvement of chemokine receptors in breast cancer metastasis", NATURE, (2001), vol. 410, doi:doi:10.1038/35065016, pages 50 - 56, XP002292390 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35065016 | - "Phase-measurement interferometry techniques", K. CREATH, Progress in Optics, (1988), vol. XXVI, pages 349 - 393 | - Y ZHAO, "Phase-resolved optical coherence tomography and optical Doppler tomography for imaging blood flow in human skin with fast scanning speed and high velocity sensitivity", OPTICS LETTER, (2000), vol. 25, no. 2, XP000928550 | - JAMES F. LEARY, "Strategies for rare cell detection and isolation", METHODS IN CELL BIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 42, pages 331 - 358 | - NATURE, (2003), vol. 426, pages 421 - 424 | - M. P. MACDONALD; G C. SPALDING; K. DHOLAKIA, "Microfluidic sorting in an optical lattice", NATURE, (2003), vol. 426, doi:doi:10.1038/nature02144, pages 421 - 424, XP002289740 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature02144 |