EP2031515 - DATA MEMORY DEVICE AND METHOD FOR INITIALIZING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Buffalo Inc. 15, Shibata-Hondori 4-chome, Minami-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 457-8520 / JP | [2009/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARAKAWA, Tadashi BUFFALO INC. 15-Ban Shibatahondori 4-Chome Minami-Ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 457-8520 / JP | [2009/10] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Kerry John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | Tomlinson, Kerry John Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07743616.0 | 11.05.2007 | [2009/10] | WO2007JP60181 | Priority number, date | JP20060136237 | 16.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006136237 | [2009/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007132931 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2031515 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/00, G06F3/06 | [2010/45] | CPC: |
G11C16/349 (EP,US);
G06F3/061 (EP,US);
G06F3/0643 (EP,US);
G06F3/0679 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/10] | G06F12/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/10] | Title | German: | DATENSPEICHERANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER INITIALISIERUNG | [2009/10] | English: | DATA MEMORY DEVICE AND METHOD FOR INITIALIZING SAME | [2009/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MÉMOIRE DE DONNÉES ET PROCÉDÉ D'INITIALISATION DE CE DISPOSITIF | [2009/10] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2008 | Translation filed | 11.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 20.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/22] | 21.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JPH11249968 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [I] 1-8 * paragraphs [0005] , [0011] , [0015] , [0016] , [0023] , [0025] , [0026] , [0032] , [0033] , [0036]; figures 1,2 *; | [E]WO2009031689 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [E] 1-8* the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH04106643 (NEC IBARAKI LTD); | [A]JPH08110868 (RICOH KK); | [A]JP2005216119 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |