EP2040472 - DATA TRANSMITTING DEVICE, DATA TRANSMITTING METHOD, AUDIO-VISUAL ENVIRONMENT CONTROL DEVICE, AUDIO-VISUAL ENVIRONMENT CONTROL SYSTEM, AND AUDIO-VISUAL ENVIRONMENT CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWANAMI, Takuya 2876-11-241, Kamatori-ch, Midori-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 266-0011 / JP | 02 /
YOSHII, Takashi 2-15-10-505, Saiwa-ch, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 266-0001 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIDA, Yasuhiro 1-4-10, Wakabadai, Naa-shi Nara 631-0837 / JP | [2009/13] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07744037.8 | 24.05.2007 | [2009/13] | WO2007JP60603 | Priority number, date | JP20060162955 | 13.06.2006 Original published format: JP 2006162955 | [2009/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007145064 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2040472 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173, H05B37/02 | [2009/13] | CPC: |
H04N21/23412 (EP,US);
H04N21/2353 (EP,US);
H04N21/236 (EP,US);
H04N21/25825 (EP,US);
H04N21/25833 (EP,US);
H04N21/26603 (EP,US);
H04N21/42202 (EP,US);
H04N21/442 (EP,US);
H05B47/155 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/13] | Title | German: | DATENSENDEEINRICHTUNG, DATENSENDEVERFAHREN, EINRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DER AUDIOVISUELLEN UMGEBUNG, SYSTEM ZUR STEUERUNG DER AUDIOVISUELLEN UMGEBUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER AUDIOVISUELLEN UMGEBUNG | [2009/13] | English: | DATA TRANSMITTING DEVICE, DATA TRANSMITTING METHOD, AUDIO-VISUAL ENVIRONMENT CONTROL DEVICE, AUDIO-VISUAL ENVIRONMENT CONTROL SYSTEM, AND AUDIO-VISUAL ENVIRONMENT CONTROL METHOD | [2009/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES, AINSI QUE DISPOSITIF, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE L'ENVIRONNEMENT AUDIOVISUEL | [2009/13] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2009 | Translation filed | 08.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 08.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/13] | 23.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.03.2013 | 30.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/25] | 09.02.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/25] | 07.03.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0195674 (DELFIN PROJECT INC [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * page 5, line 20 - line 29 * * page 9, line 3 - line 5 * * page 10, line 15 - line 20 ** page 14, line 5 - page 15, line 31; figures 8,14-16 *; | [X]US2002154773 (STANDARD GARY [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] - [0039] , [0050] , [0054] , [0055] , [0061] , [0062] , [0066] , [0069] , [0070]; figures 2,4,5,9,10 *; | [X]US2002169817 (EVES DAVID A [GB], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0005] , [0023] , [0024] , [0026] , [0028] , [0031] , [0032] , [0035]; figures 1-4 *; | [XA]WO2004006578 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-5,9-14,16 * page 1, lines 1-3 * * page 1, line 28 - page 2, line 7 * * page 2, line 15 - page 3, line 4 * * page 4, line 8 - page 6, line 7; figures 1-3 * [A] 6-8,15 | International search | [X]JP2001343900 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2005531909 ; | [A]JP2005310630 (SHARP KK); | [A]JP2005341122 (SHARP KK) | by applicant | JPH02158094 | JPH02253503 | JPH03184203 |