EP2023309 - VEHICLE DISCRIMINATING DEVICE, VEHICLE DISCRIMINATING METHOD, VEHICLE DISCRIMINATING PROGRAM, AND PROGRAM RECORDING MEDIUM WITH THE VEHICLE DISCRIMINATING PROGRAM STORED THEREIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2009/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATA, Sahoko c/o FUJITSU OITA SOFTWARE LABORATORIES LIMITED 17-58, Higashikasugamachi Oita-shi, Oita 870-8551 / JP | 02 /
ANDO, Atsuyoshi c/o FUJITSU OITA SOFTWARE LABORATORIES LIMITED 17-58, Higashikasugamachi Oita-shi, Oita 870-8551 / JP | 03 /
KODAMA, Kenji c/o FUJITSU OITA SOFTWARE LABORATORIES LIMITED 17-58, Higashikasugamachi Oita-shi, Oita 870-8551 / JP | 04 /
SHINJO, Takako c/o FUJITSU OITA SOFTWARE LABORATORIES LIMITED 17-58, Higashikasugamachi Oita-shi, Oita 870-8551 / JP | 05 /
TAKAHASHI, Kunikazu c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/45] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2009/07] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake 5th Floor, Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07744113.7 | 25.05.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007JP60679 | Priority number, date | JP20060147240 | 26.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006147240 | [2009/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007139003 | Date: | 06.12.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2023309 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2023309 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/017, G06K9/00 | [2010/09] | CPC: |
G08G1/0175 (EP,US);
G06V20/52 (EP,US);
G08G1/015 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/07] | G08G1/015, G06T1/00, G06T7/00, G08G1/04, H04N7/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/25] |
Former [2009/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGUNTERSCHEIDUNGSEINRICHTUNG, FAHRZEUGUNTERSCHEIDUNGSVERFAHREN, FAHRZEUGUNTERSCHEIDUNGSPROGRAMM UND PROGRAMMAUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM MIT DARIN GESPEICHERTEM FAHRZEUGUNTERSCHEIDUNGSPROGRAMM | [2009/07] | English: | VEHICLE DISCRIMINATING DEVICE, VEHICLE DISCRIMINATING METHOD, VEHICLE DISCRIMINATING PROGRAM, AND PROGRAM RECORDING MEDIUM WITH THE VEHICLE DISCRIMINATING PROGRAM STORED THEREIN | [2009/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DISCRIMINATION DE VEHICULE, PROCEDE DE DISCRIMINATION DE VEHICULE, PROGRAMME DE DISCRIMINATION DE VEHICULE ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT DE PROGRAMME COMPORTANT LE PROGRAMME DE DISCRIMINATION DE VEHICULE | [2009/07] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2008 | Translation filed | 19.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 30.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005169530 (NAKAI HIROAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0068] * | [X] - CHUNG-LIN HUANG ET AL, "A vision-based vehicle identification system", PATTERN RECOGNITION, 2004. ICPR 2004. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 17TH INTERNAT IONAL CONFERENCE ON CAMBRIDGE, UK AUG. 23-26, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040823), vol. 4, ISBN 978-0-7695-2128-2, pages 364 - 367, XP010723936 [X] 1,2,7,9,11 * abstract * * page 366, column L, paragraph 3 - page 367, column L, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICPR.2004.1333778 | [X] - LAI A H S ET AL, "Vehicle type classification from visual-based dimension estimation", INTELLIGENT TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS, 2001. PROCEEDINGS. 2001 IEEE AUGUST 25-29, 2001, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20010825), ISBN 978-0-7803-7194-1, pages 201 - 206, XP010555770 [X] 1,2,7,9,11 * abstract * * page 201, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 201, column R, paragraph 3 * | [X] - SURENDRA GUPTE ET AL, "Detection and Classification of Vehicles", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INTELLIGENT TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20020301), vol. 3, no. 1, ISSN 1524-9050, XP011074872 [X] 1,2,7,9,11 * abstract * * page 45, column L * | International search | [Y]JP2001216598 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JPH0855294 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]JPH06309588 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [A]JPS62222391 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) | by applicant | JP2000149181 | JP2002008186 | JP3453952B | - Handbook of Image Analysis, UNIVERSITY OF TOKYO PRESS, page 1231 | - Handbook of Image Analysis, UNIVERSITY OF TOKYO PRESS, pages 1577 - 1579 |