EP2028097 - TORQUE DETECTOR AND ELECTRICALLY ASSISTED BICYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUNSTAR GIKEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-1, Asahi-machi Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1134 / JP | [2009/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIIE, Akihito c/o Sunstar Giken Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-1, Asahi-machi Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 5691134 / JP | 02 /
YAMAGUCHI, Katsuhiro c/o Sunstar Giken Kabushiki Kaisha 3-1, Asahi-machi Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 5691134 / JP | [2014/19] |
Former [2009/09] | 01 /
YOSHIIE, Akihito c/o Sunstar Giken Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-1, Asahi-machi Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 5691134 / JP | ||
02 /
YAMAGUCHI, Katsuhiro c/o Sunstar Giken Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-1, Asahi-machi Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 5691134 / JP | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2009/09] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 07744144.2 | 25.05.2007 | [2009/09] | WO2007JP60710 | Priority number, date | JP20060151956 | 31.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006151956 | [2009/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007139021 | Date: | 06.12.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2028097 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2028097 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B62M6/50 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
B62M6/50 (EP);
G01L3/1435 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/09] | B62M23/02, B62J39/00, G01L3/10 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL [2009/27] |
Former [2009/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DREHMOMENTDETEKTOR UND ELEKTRISCH UNTERSTÜTZTES FAHRRAD | [2009/09] | English: | TORQUE DETECTOR AND ELECTRICALLY ASSISTED BICYCLE | [2009/09] | French: | DÉTECTEUR DE COUPLE ET BICYCLETTE ASSISTÉE ÉLECTRIQUEMENT | [2009/09] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2008 | Translation filed | 18.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 06.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1193171 (SUNSTAR ENGINEERING INC [JP]; UNI SUNSTAR BV [NL] SUNSTAR ENGINEERING) [X] 1,2,15,16 * figure -; claim - *; | WO0075006 [ ] (SUNSTAR ENGINEERING INC [JP]; UNI SUNSTAR BV [NL]; YOSHIIE AKIHITO [JP) [ ] * abstract *; | [X]EP0765804 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,15 * paragraph [0098]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP1473219 (SUNSTAR ENGINEERING INC [JP]; SUNSTAR SUISSE SA [CH]) [A] 1,15 * figure -; claim - * | International search | [Y]WO0075006 (SUNSTAR ENGINEERING INC [JP], et al); | [Y]JPH0885491 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JP2004099019 (MINAMI MASABUMI, et al); | [A]WO02076813 (SUNSTAR ENGINEERING INC [JP], et al); | [A]JP2000272575 (SUNSTAR ENGINEERING INC, et al); | [A]JP2002154473 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) | Examination | JP2002154473 | by applicant | EP1193171 |