EP2046094 - SURFACE EMITTING ELECTROLUMINESCENT ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0031 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMASHITA, Seiji c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 798, Miyanodai, kasei-machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
SATO, Tadanobu c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 798, Miyanodai, kasei-machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
SHIRATA, Masashi c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 798, Miyanodai, kasei-machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa / JP | [2009/15] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07744164.0 | 25.05.2007 | [2009/15] | WO2007JP60730 | Priority number, date | JP20060146676 | 26.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006146676 | [2009/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007139033 | Date: | 06.12.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2046094 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/22, H05B33/14, C09K11/56, C09K11/62, C09K11/70, C09K11/74, C09K11/88 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
H05B33/22 (EP,KR,US);
C09K11/70 (KR);
H05B33/14 (KR);
H05B33/26 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2009/32] |
Former [2009/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENEMITTIERENDES ELEKTROLUMINESZENZELEMENT | [2009/15] | English: | SURFACE EMITTING ELECTROLUMINESCENT ELEMENT | [2009/15] | French: | ÉLÉMENT ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT À ÉMISSION PAR LA SURFACE | [2009/15] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2008 | Translation filed | 25.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 30.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/48] | 12.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2004090068 (UNIV MCMASTER [CA], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 7, line 7 - page 8, line 1; figure 1; claims 12-14,1623 * * page 10, line 21 - page 11, line 15 * [Y] 4; | [X]JP2000048961 (TDK CORP) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] - [0 28] , [0 30] - [0048] - [0 63] - [0079]; claims 1,2,5 *; | [Y]JP2005116320 (JAPAN BROADCASTING CORP) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0020] - [0022] * | International search | [X]WO2004090068 (UNIV MCMASTER [CA], et al); | [X]JP2000048961 (TDK CORP); | [Y]JP2005116320 (JAPAN BROADCASTING CORP) | by applicant | JPH07166161 | JPH09245511 | JP2002062530 | JP2003249349 | JPS6327837B | JPH05166582 | JPH0922781 | JPS463335 | JPS55152776 | JPH05197074 | JPH05232630 | JPH05307232 | JPH06211813 | JPH0853427 | JPH08234364 | JPH08239368 | JPH0931067 | JPH10115898 | JPH10147577 | JPH10182621 | DE19739797 | EP0711804 | JPH08501291 | JP2006146676 | - KEIKOTAI DOGAKUKAI; OHM-SHA, Keikotai Handbook | - GEKKAN OPTRONICS, (200410), pages 115 - 165 | - KINO ZAIRYO, (200504), vol. 25, no. 4 |