19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
14.09.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] |
06.10.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
02.10.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
02.10.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
02.10.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.05.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.05.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.03.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.11.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.03.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.02.2016 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.10.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.10.2015 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.09.2015 |
Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art |
|
01.06.2015 |
New entry: Invitation to provide information on prior art |
|
16.05.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.07.2014 |
Change - representative |
published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] |
25.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.05.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.02.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.11.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.08.2009 |
First examination report |
|
12.08.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.06.2009 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] |
29.05.2009 |
Change - designated states |
published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] |
29.05.2009 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] |
26.05.2009 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
18.05.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.04.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] |
06.02.2009 |
Change - designated states |
published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] |
03.02.2009 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.01.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] |
16.01.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] |
16.12.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.12.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.12.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|