EP2025723 - AQUEOUS CARBON BLACK PIGMENT AND WATER-BASED DISPERSION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokai Carbon Company, Ltd. 2-3 Kita-Aoyama 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8636 / JP | [2009/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEKIYAMA, Makoto c/o Tokai Carbon Co., Ltd. 2-3, Kita-Aoyama 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8636 / JP | [2017/45] |
Former [2009/08] | 01 /
SEKIYAMA, Makoto c/o Tokai Carbon Co., Ltd. 2-3, Kita-Aoyama 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8636 / JP | Representative(s) | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter, et al Flaccus · Müller-Wolff Patentanwälte Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | [2014/33] |
Former [2009/22] | Müller-Wolff, Thomas, et al Flaccus · Müller-Wolff Patentanwälte Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | ||
Former [2009/08] | Müller-Wolff, Thomas Patentanwalt, Postfach 19 02 17 53037 Bonn / DE | Application number, filing date | 07744630.0 | 29.05.2007 | [2009/08] | WO2007JP61244 | Priority number, date | JP20060154216 | 02.06.2006 Original published format: JP 2006154216 | [2009/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007142168 | Date: | 13.12.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2025723 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2025723 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/56, C09C3/10, C09D11/00, C09D17/00 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
C09C1/56 (EP,KR,US);
C09C1/48 (EP,US);
C09C1/565 (EP,US);
C09C3/10 (KR);
C09D11/324 (EP,KR,US);
C09D17/00 (KR);
C09D17/005 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2017/45] |
Former [2009/11] | DE, GB | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGES RUSSPIGMENT UND WASSERBASISDISPERSION DAVON | [2009/08] | English: | AQUEOUS CARBON BLACK PIGMENT AND WATER-BASED DISPERSION THEREOF | [2009/08] | French: | PIGMENT AQUEUX NOIR DE CARBONE, ET DISPERSION AQUEUSE DE CE PIGMENT | [2009/08] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2008 | Translation filed | 05.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 03.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2015 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 07.09.2015 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 22.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 29.05.2018 | [2019/21] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003195274 (NAKAMURA HIROTO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0124] , [0141] , [0142] , [0213] , [0217] - [0219] - [0225] , [0241] , [0255] - [0264]; table 8 *; | [X]US2002077383 (TAKAO NAGAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0027] , [0032] , [0041] , [0046] - [0051]; example 4 * | International search | [A]JPS6479278 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND); | [A]JP2003155436 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [A]JP2003342502 (CANON FINETECH INC); | [A]JP2000327984 (TOYO INK MFG CO); | [A]JPH10183040 (TOYO INK MFG CO); | [A]JPH11349848 (TOKAI CARBON KK); | [A]JPH09194775 (TOYO INK MFG CO); | [A]JP2003096333 (TOKAI CARBON KK); | [A]JP2005132985 (CANON KK) | Examination | JP2005181753 | by applicant | JPS4818186 | JPH083498 | JPH08319444 | JPH1149974 | JPH09286938 |