EP2039445 - SLIDE VALVE DEVICE FOR AUTOMATIC SURFACE PRESSURE APPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHINAGAWA REFRACTORIES CO., LTD. 1-7, Kudan-kita 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | [2009/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITSUI, Kenji c/o Shinagawa Refractories Co., Ltd. 1-7, Kudan-kita 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | 02 /
OSADA, Mototsugu c/o Shinagawa Refractories Co., Ltd. 1-7, Kudan-kita 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | 03 /
MORII, Hiroaki c/o Shinagawa Refractories Co., Ltd. 1-7, Kudan-kita 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | [2014/26] |
Former [2009/13] | 01 /
MITSUI, Kenji c/o Shinagawa Refractories Co., Ltd. 1-7, Kudan-kita 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | ||
02 /
OSADA, Mototsugu c/o Shinagawa Refractories Co., Ltd. 1-7, Kudan-kita 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | |||
03 /
MORII, Hiroaki c/o Shinagawa Refractories Co., Ltd. 1-7, Kudan-kita 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/13] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07744654.0 | 04.06.2007 | [2009/13] | WO2007JP61272 | Priority number, date | JP20060158356 | 07.06.2006 Original published format: JP 2006158356 | [2009/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007142178 | Date: | 13.12.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2039445 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2039445 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B22D41/40 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
B22D41/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/13] | B22D11/10 | Designated contracting states | CZ, DE, GB [2009/28] |
Former [2009/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHIEBERVENTIL ZUM AUFBRINGEN EINES AUTOMATISCHEN OBERFLÄCHENDRUCKS | [2014/10] | English: | SLIDE VALVE DEVICE FOR AUTOMATIC SURFACE PRESSURE APPLICATION | [2009/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF TIROIR POUR APPLICATION D'UNE PRESSION SUPERFICIELLE AUTOMATIQUE | [2009/13] |
Former [2009/13] | SCHIEBERVENTIL FÜR AUTOMATISCHE OBERFLÄCHENANWENDUNG | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2008 | Translation filed | 19.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/13] | 08.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AU2005303181 (SHINAGAWA REFRACTORIES CO) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | JP2006136912 [ ] (SHINAGAWA REFRACTORIES CO) | International search | [X]JP2006136912 (SHINAGAWA REFRACTORIES CO) | by applicant | JP2004327405 | JPH0138592B | JPH06226430 |