EP2128940 - QUANTUM CASCADE LASER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [2015/35] |
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho, Higashi-ku, Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDAMURA, Tadataka c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 02 /
AKIKUSA, Naota c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 03 /
FUJITA, Kazuue c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 04 /
SUGIYAMA, Atsushi c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 05 /
OCHIAI, Takahide c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [2015/35] |
Former [2009/49] | 01 /
EDAMURA, Tadataka c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | ||
02 /
AKIKUSA, Naota c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | |||
03 /
FUJITA, Kazuue c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | |||
04 /
SUGIYAMA, Atsushi c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | |||
05 /
OCHIAI, Takahide c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/35] |
Former [2009/49] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07744803.3 | 06.06.2007 | [2009/49] | WO2007JP61460 | Priority number, date | JP20070009519 | 18.01.2007 Original published format: JP 2007009519 | [2009/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008087754 | Date: | 24.07.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2128940 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2128940 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/343 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
H01S5/3402 (EP,US);
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
H01S5/34313 (EP,US);
H01S5/3086 (EP,US);
H01S5/309 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/35] |
Former [2009/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | QUANTEN-KASKADENLASER | [2009/49] | English: | QUANTUM CASCADE LASER | [2009/49] | French: | LASER À CASCADE QUANTIQUE | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2009 | Translation filed | 30.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 01.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.06.2007 | AT | 26.08.2015 | BE | 26.08.2015 | BG | 26.08.2015 | CY | 26.08.2015 | CZ | 26.08.2015 | DK | 26.08.2015 | EE | 26.08.2015 | ES | 26.08.2015 | FI | 26.08.2015 | IT | 26.08.2015 | LT | 26.08.2015 | LV | 26.08.2015 | MC | 26.08.2015 | NL | 26.08.2015 | PL | 26.08.2015 | RO | 26.08.2015 | SE | 26.08.2015 | SI | 26.08.2015 | SK | 26.08.2015 | TR | 26.08.2015 | GR | 27.11.2015 | IS | 26.12.2015 | PT | 28.12.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 06.06.2007 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
TR | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 06.06.2007 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
TR | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 06.06.2007 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 26.08.2015 | |
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 26.08.2015 | |
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 26.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6324199 (CAPASSO FEDERICO [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 6, lines 25-54; figure 2 *; | [AD]US5745516 (CAPASSO FEDERICO [US], et al) [AD] 1-4 * figure 2 *; | [AD]US5457709 (CAPASSO FEDERICO [US], et al) [AD] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A] - FAIST JÉRO ME ET AL, "Quantum-cascade lasers based on a bound-to-continuum transition", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, US, (20010108), vol. 78, no. 2, doi:10.1063/1.1339843, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 147 - 149, XP012027978 [A] 1-4 * figure 2a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1339843 | [XP] - FUJITA K ET AL, "Room temperature, continuous-wave operation of quantum cascade lasers with single phonon resonance-continuum depopulation structures grown by metal organic vapor-phase epitaxy", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, US, (20071004), vol. 91, no. 14, doi:10.1063/1.2795793, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 141121 - 141121, XP012099497 [XP] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.2795793 | International search | [X]JPH08279647 (AT & T CORP); | [A]JPH10144995 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC); | [A]JP2004521481 ; | [A]JP2004507903 | by applicant | US5457709 | US5745516 | US6751244 | US6922427 | JP2004521481 | JP2004507903 | - M. BECK ET AL., "Continuous Wave Operation of a Mid-Infrared Semiconductor Laser at Room Temperature", SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 295, pages 301 - 305 | - J. S. YU ET AL., "High-Power Coutinuous-Wave Operation of a 6 mu;m Quantum-Cascade Laser at Room Temperature", APPL. PHYS. LETT., (2003), vol. 83, pages 2503 - 2505 | - A. EVANS ET AL., "Continuous-Wave Operation of lambda; 4.8 mu;m Quantum-Cascade Lasers at Room Temeprature", APPL. PHYS. LETT., (2004), vol. 85, doi:doi:10.1063/1.1793340, pages 2166 - 2168, XP001226951 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1793340 | - A. TREDICUCCI ET AL., "High Performance Interminiband Quantum Cascade Lasers with Graded Superlattices", APPL. PHYS. LETT., (1998), vol. 73, doi:doi:10.1063/1.122391, pages 2101 - 2103, XP012021120 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.122391 | - M. BECK ET AL., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 295, pages 301 - 305 | - J. S. YU ET AL., APPL. PHYS. LETT., (2003), vol. 83, pages 2503 - 2505 | - A. EVANS ET AL., APPL. PHYS. LETT., (2004), vol. 85, pages 2166 - 2168 | - A. TREDICUCCI ET AL., APPL. PHYS. LETT., (1998), vol. 73, pages 2101 - 2103 | - D. HOFSTETTER ET AL., APPL. PHYS. LETT., (2001), vol. 78, pages 396 - 398 | - S. BLASER ET AL., "RoomTemperature, Continuous-Wave, Single-Mode Quantum-Cascade Lasers at lambda; 5.4 mu;m", APPL. PHYS. LETT., (2005), vol. 86, page 041109 |