EP2057932 - MEDICAL IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS AND MEDICAL IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/20] | IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE FOR MEDICAL USE AND IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD FOR MEDICAL USE | ||
[2018/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2009/20] | For all designated states Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAWA, Miho c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 02 /
NISHIMURA, Hirokazu c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Hideki c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 04 /
INOUE, Ryoko c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 05 /
NAKAMURA, Kenji c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2018/49] |
Former [2009/20] | 01 /
SAWA, Miho c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
02 /
NISHIMURA, Hirokazu c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
03 /
TANAKA, Hideki c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
04 /
INOUE, Ryoko c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
05 /
NAKAMURA, Kenji c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [2018/49] |
Former [2009/51] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/20] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07744947.8 | 08.06.2007 | [2009/20] | WO2007JP61627 | Priority number, date | JP20060228192 | 24.08.2006 Original published format: JP 2006228192 | [2009/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008023491 | Date: | 28.02.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2057932 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2057932 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/04, G06T1/00, G06T7/00, G06T7/507, G06T7/13, G06T7/44, G06T7/181 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
G06T7/13 (EP,US);
G06T7/181 (EP,US);
G06T7/44 (EP,US);
G06T7/507 (EP,US);
A61B1/042 (EP,US);
G06T2200/04 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10016 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10068 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/20] | A61B1/04, G06T1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2018/49] |
Former [2009/38] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEARBEITUNG MEDIZINISCHER BILDER | [2018/49] | English: | MEDICAL IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS AND MEDICAL IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD | [2018/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES MEDICALS | [2018/49] |
Former [2009/20] | BILDBEARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR MEDIZINISCHEN VERWENDUNG UND BILDBEARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR MEDIZINISCHEN VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [2009/20] | IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE FOR MEDICAL USE AND IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD FOR MEDICAL USE | ||
Former [2009/20] | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES A USAGE MEDICAL | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2009 | Translation filed | 11.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 04.05.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.08.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 08.06.2019 | FR | 30.06.2019 | [2020/29] |
Former [2020/24] | GB | 08.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9837517 (WAKE FOREST UNIVERSITY SCHOOL [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 10 - page 13 * * page 20 *; | [A]WO03034176 (YOSHIDA HIROYUKI [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US2004101181 (GIGER MARYELLEN L [US], et al) [A] 1,2,8,9 * paragraphs [0080] , [ 120] - [0126] - [ 133]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2006050991 (JEREBKO ANNA [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * figures 1, 3, 4, 6a, 6b ** paragraphs [0005] , [00 7] , [0 12] , [0 40] - [0042] - [0 47] , [0 48] * | International search | [A]JPH11104072 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) | by applicant | US2003223627 | JP2005192880 | JP2006228192 |