EP2110223 - INJECTION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/43] | SCREW AND INJECTION APPARATUS | ||
[2015/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Heavy Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Osaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-6025 / JP | For all designated states Spiral Logic Limited Unit 06 G/F, Block B, Po Lung Centre 11 Wang Chiu Rd, Kowloon Bay KL Hong Kong / CN | [2015/42] |
Former [2009/43] | For all designated states Sumitomo Heavy Industries, LTD. 1-1, Osaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-6025 / JP | ||
For all designated states Spiral Logic Limited Unit 06 G/F, Block B, Po Lung Centre 11 Wang Chiu Rd, Kowloon Bay KL Hong Kong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARUMOTO, Hirotsugu c/o SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. Chiba Works 731-1 Naganumaharacho Inage-ku Chiba-shi Chiba 263-0001 / JP | 02 /
KAMIYA, Munekatsu Unit 06, G/F, Block B Po Lung Centre 11 Wang Chiu Rd Kowloon Bay KL, Hong Kong / CN | [2015/42] |
Former [2009/43] | 01 /
MARUMOTO, Hirotsugu c/o SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. Chiba Works 731-1 Naganumaharacho Inage-ku Chiba-shi Chiba 263-0001 / JP | ||
02 /
KAMIYA, Munekatsu Unit 06, G/F, Block B Po Lung Centre 11 Wang Chiu Rd Kowloon Bay KL, Hong Kong / CN | Representative(s) | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/43] | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07745098.9 | 12.06.2007 | [2009/43] | WO2007JP61811 | Priority number, date | JP20070030377 | 09.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007030377 | [2009/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008096461 | Date: | 14.08.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2110223 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2110223 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/60, B29C47/58 | [2012/42] | CPC: |
B29C45/60 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/501 (EP,US);
B29C48/505 (KR);
B29C48/53 (EP,US);
B29C48/63 (EP,US);
B29C48/793 (EP,US);
B29C48/832 (EP,US);
B29C48/03 (EP,US);
B29C48/285 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/43] | B29C45/60, B29C47/60 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/42] |
Former [2009/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | INJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2015/17] | English: | INJECTION APPARATUS | [2015/17] | French: | APPAREIL À INJECTION | [2015/17] |
Former [2009/43] | SCHNECKE UND INJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2009/43] | SCREW AND INJECTION APPARATUS | ||
Former [2009/43] | APPAREIL À VIS ET À INJECTION | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2009 | Translation filed | 10.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 08.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.03.2015 | 24.03.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.06.2007 | BE | 14.10.2015 | BG | 14.10.2015 | CY | 14.10.2015 | CZ | 14.10.2015 | DK | 14.10.2015 | EE | 14.10.2015 | ES | 14.10.2015 | FI | 14.10.2015 | IT | 14.10.2015 | LT | 14.10.2015 | LV | 14.10.2015 | MC | 14.10.2015 | NL | 14.10.2015 | PL | 14.10.2015 | RO | 14.10.2015 | SE | 14.10.2015 | SI | 14.10.2015 | SK | 14.10.2015 | TR | 14.10.2015 | GR | 15.01.2016 | IS | 14.02.2016 | PT | 15.02.2016 | GB | 12.06.2016 | IE | 12.06.2016 | LU | 12.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | FR | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 12.06.2007 | |
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
TR | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
GB | 12.06.2016 | ||
IE | 12.06.2016 | ||
LU | 12.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 12.06.2007 | |
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
TR | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
GB | 12.06.2016 | ||
IE | 12.06.2016 | ||
LU | 12.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 12.06.2007 | |
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
GB | 12.06.2016 | ||
IE | 12.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | BE | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
GB | 12.06.2016 | ||
IE | 12.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | BE | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 14.10.2015 | |
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 14.10.2015 | |
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 14.10.2015 | |
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 14.10.2015 | |
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
LT | 14.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS6440515U (UNKNOWN) [Y] 10,11* figure - *; | [X]FR2738767 (APPLIC SCIENT ET MECANIQUES SA [FR]) [X] 1-5,7,9,12 * page 9, line 18 - line 30 * * page 9, line 6 - line 16; figure - *; | [Y]JP2002248664 (KISHIMOTO SANGYO CO) [Y] 6 * abstract *; | [XY]JP2005131854 (UBE MACHINERY CORP LTD, et al) [X] 1-5,7,12 * paragraphs [0017] , [0020] * [Y] 6,8,10,11; | [Y]JP2006327091 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) [Y] 8 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPS6440515U ; | [Y]JPH10166412 (MIYAMA KASEI KK); | [Y]JP2002248664 (KISHIMOTO SANGYO CO); | [Y]JP2005161809 (SPIRAL LOGIC LTD); | [Y]JP2006088533 (NISSEI PLASTICS IND CO); | [Y]JP2006327091 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) | by applicant | JP2004050415 |