EP2039591 - CENTER FRAME IN CRAWLER TRAVEL DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CENTER FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Komatsu, Ltd. 3-6, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8414 / JP | [2012/15] |
Former [2009/13] | For all designated states Komatsu, Ltd. 3-6, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8414 / JP | ||
For all designated states Komatsu Utility Co., Ltd. 2-4-1, Shiba-Koen, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0011 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKANO, Yoshiyuki c/o Komatsu Utility Co., Ltd. 1-9, Minamidai, Kawagoe-shi Saitama 3501192 / JP | 02 /
KIMURA, Yasuharu c/o Komatsu Utility Co., Ltd. 1-9, Minamidai, Kawagoe-shi Saitama 3501192 / JP | 03 /
MISU, Akira c/o Komatsu Utility Co., Ltd. 1-9, Minamidai, Kawagoe-shi Saitama 3501192 / JP | [2009/13] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/13] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07745399.1 | 15.06.2007 | [2009/13] | WO2007JP62144 | Priority number, date | JP20060190388 | 11.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006190388 | [2009/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008007515 | Date: | 17.01.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2039591 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2039591 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B62D21/06, B62D21/18 | [2009/13] | CPC: |
B62D55/10 (EP,US);
B62D21/186 (EP,US);
E02F9/02 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49622 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2009/32] |
Former [2009/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MITTELRAHMEN IN EINER RAUPENKETTENFAHRVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES MITTELRAHMENS | [2009/13] | English: | CENTER FRAME IN CRAWLER TRAVEL DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CENTER FRAME | [2009/13] | French: | OSSATURE CENTRALE DE DISPOSITIF DE DEPLACEMENT D'ENGIN A CHENILLES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CETTE OSSATURE CENTRALE | [2009/13] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2008 | Translation filed | 18.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/13] | 12.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1564113 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,8 * paragraphs [0064] - [0091]; figures 1-6 * [I] 7; | [A]EP1566326 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * figures 1-24 *; | [A]WO03042022 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | International search | [A]JP2005001651 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2004189003 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2005255141 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD, et al) | by applicant | JP2005255141 |