EP2007239 - A FUNCTIONAL FOOTWEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baek, Sang Gon 102-201 Hanshin Apt. 795-14, Goejeong-dong Saha-gu Busan 604-080 / KR | [2009/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/01] | Representative(s) | Pulieri, Gianluca Antonio Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria, 11 25122 Brescia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | Pulieri, Gianluca Antonio Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza dela Vittoria, 11 25122 Brescia / IT | Application number, filing date | 07745713.3 | 30.03.2007 | [2009/01] | WO2007KR01550 | Priority number, date | KR20060033916 | 14.04.2006 Original published format: KR 20060033916 | [2009/01] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007119941 | Date: | 25.10.2007 | Language: | KO | [2007/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2007239 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A43B7/38 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
A43B13/38 (EP,US);
A43B13/188 (KR);
A43B13/40 (KR);
A43B7/145 (EP,KR,US);
A43B7/38 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUNKTIONELLER SCHUH | [2009/01] | English: | A FUNCTIONAL FOOTWEAR | [2009/01] | French: | ARTICLE CHAUSSANT FONCTIONNEL | [2009/01] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2007 | Translation filed | 03.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 03.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 11.02.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]KR100636399B (BAEK SANG GON [KR]); | [A]JP3011183U ; | [A]KR200251125Y ; | [A]KR0037171Y |