EP2008501 - ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DIODE UNIT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu, Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2009/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SON, Se-Hwan 102-704, Hyundai Apt., Doryong-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon Metropolitan City, 305-340 / KR | 02 /
CHOI, Hyeon 203-601, Expo Apt., Jeonmin-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon Metropolitan City, 305-761 / KR | [2009/01] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/01] | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07745946.9 | 12.04.2007 | [2009/01] | WO2007KR01783 | Priority number, date | KR20060033119 | 12.04.2006 Original published format: KR 20060033119 | [2009/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007117126 | Date: | 18.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2008501 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2008501 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/52, H05B33/10 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
H05B33/10 (EP,KR,US);
H05B33/04 (KR);
H10K50/182 (EP);
H10K50/841 (US);
H10K50/8426 (US);
H10K50/846 (US);
H10K59/871 (EP,KR);
H10K59/872 (EP,KR);
H10K59/874 (EP,KR);
H10K30/53 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/01] | H05B33/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/01] | Title | German: | ORGANISCHE LEUCHTDIODENEINHEIT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2009/01] | English: | ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DIODE UNIT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2009/01] | French: | UNITÉ À DIODES ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTES ORGANIQUES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2009/01] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 10.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 31.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.04.2007 | AT | 14.11.2012 | BE | 14.11.2012 | CY | 14.11.2012 | CZ | 14.11.2012 | DK | 14.11.2012 | EE | 14.11.2012 | FI | 14.11.2012 | IS | 14.11.2012 | IT | 14.11.2012 | LT | 14.11.2012 | LV | 14.11.2012 | MC | 14.11.2012 | MT | 14.11.2012 | NL | 14.11.2012 | PL | 14.11.2012 | RO | 14.11.2012 | SE | 14.11.2012 | SI | 14.11.2012 | SK | 14.11.2012 | TR | 14.11.2012 | BG | 14.02.2013 | GR | 15.02.2013 | ES | 25.02.2013 | PT | 14.03.2013 | IE | 12.04.2013 | LU | 12.04.2013 | CH | 30.04.2013 | LI | 30.04.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 12.04.2007 | |
AT | 14.11.2012 | ||
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
TR | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
IE | 12.04.2013 | ||
LU | 12.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
TR | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
IE | 12.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
IE | 12.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
IE | 12.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/01] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 14.11.2012 | |
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 14.11.2012 | |
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 14.11.2012 | |
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 14.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0776147 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-22 * abstract * * column 4, line 40 - column 6, line 31 *; | [Y]US2003038590 (SILVERNAIL JEFFREY ALAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * abstract ** paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0031] - [0054]; figures 1-2 *; | [Y]US2005088087 (OGAWA TAKASHI [JP]) [Y] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2006022592 (BOROSON MICHAEL L [US]) [Y] 1-22 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0020] , [0029] - [0030] - [0033] , [0038] - [0042] - [0047] * * figure 3 * | International search | [A]JPH03283292 (KANSAI NIPPON ELECTRIC); | [A]US6538375 (DUGGAL ANIL RAJ [US], et al); | [A]US6771021 (COK RONALD S [US]); | [A]US6936964 (COK RONALD S [US]); | [A]US2006028125 (KIM HOON [KR], et al) | by applicant | EP0776147 | US2003038590 | JP2005108643 | US2006022592 |