EP2060026 - METHOD OF CONTROLLING DATA TRANSMISSION IN A WIRELESS RELAY SYSTEM, AND THE RELAY SYSTEM IMPLEMENTING THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2019/14] |
Former [2012/39] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | ||
Former [2009/21] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Young-Doo No.305, 414-2 Maetan 3(sam)-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-803 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Eung Sun No.201-904 Hwanggol Maeul Sinmyeong Apt. Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-744 / KR | 03 /
AHN, Chang Wook 4/4, 33-8 Nongseong 1(il)-dong Seo-gu Gwangju 502-809 / KR | 04 /
NAM, Seung Hoon No.1022-504 Sinsigaji 10-danji Apt. Sinjeong 1(il)-dong Yangcheon-gu Seoul 158-770 / KR | [2019/14] |
Former [2009/21] | 01 /
KIM, Young-Doo No.305, 414-2 Maetan 3(sam)-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-803 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Eung Sun No.201-904 Hwanggol Maeul Sinmyeong Apt. Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-744 / KR | |||
03 /
AHN, Chang Wook 4/4, 33-8 Nongseong 1(il)-dong Seo-gu Gwangju 502-809 / KR | |||
04 /
NAM, Seung Hoon No.1022-504 Sinsigaji 10-danji Apt. Sinjeong 1(il)-dong Yangcheon-gu Seoul 158-770 / KR | Representative(s) | Grootscholten, Johannes A.M. Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2019/14] |
Former [2009/21] | Grootscholten, Johannes A.M. Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 07746417.0 | 09.05.2007 | [2009/21] | WO2007KR02264 | Priority number, date | KR20060078940 | 21.08.2006 Original published format: KR 20060078940 | [2009/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008023878 | Date: | 28.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2060026 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2060026 | Date: | 03.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/18 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
H04W28/18 (EP,KR,US);
H04W40/22 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0025 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0668 (EP,KR,US);
H04L2001/0097 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/21] | H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2019/14] |
Former [2009/38] | DE, FR, GB, NL | ||
Former [2009/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER DATENÜBERTRAGUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN RELAISSYSTEM UND DAS VERFAHREN IMPLEMENTIERENDES RELAISSYSTEM | [2009/21] | English: | METHOD OF CONTROLLING DATA TRANSMISSION IN A WIRELESS RELAY SYSTEM, AND THE RELAY SYSTEM IMPLEMENTING THE METHOD | [2009/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES DANS UN SYSTÈME DE RELAIS SANS FIL, ET SYSTÈME DE RELAIS METTANT EN OEUVRE LEDIT PROCÉDÉ | [2009/21] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/21] | 24.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.02.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.02.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 21.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 03.04.2019 | [2019/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2004114639 (OLDENBORGH MARC VAN [NL], et al) [X] 9,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0042] - [0043] - [0046] - [0051] - [0057] * [Y] 1-8,11-15; | [YA]US2005014464 (LARSSON PETER [SE]) [Y] 1-8,11-15 * abstract * * columns 15-19, 4 *[A] 9,10; | [XA] - MAXEMCHUK ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "Dispersity Routing", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS. SAN FRANCISCO, JUNE 16-18, 1975 ELEVENTH CONF; [INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS], NEW YORK, I.E.E.E, US, (19750616), vol. CONF. 1975, pages 41 - 10, XP002181844 [X] 9,10 * page 1, left-hand column, line 30 to right-hand column, line 11 * [A] 1-8,11-15 | International search | [A]US2002187746 (CHENG RAY-GUANG [TW], et al); | [A]EP1357713 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2005067173 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) |