19.10.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
30.07.2012 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.07.2012 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.01.2012 |
First examination report |
|
19.01.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.09.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.06.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.02.2011 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] |
18.02.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] |
29.06.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.06.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.06.2009 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
19.06.2009 |
Change - designated states |
published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] |
19.06.2009 |
Change - extension states |
published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] |
03.04.2009 |
Change - inventor |
published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] |
03.03.2009 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.02.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] |
06.02.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] |
03.09.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.08.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.08.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.08.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
07.03.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|