EP2032318 - SHAVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dorco Co., Ltd 931 Gorim-dong Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 449-923 / KR | [2009/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Young Ho 104-1401 Sinhwan Apt. 744-1 Geumjeong-dong Gunpo-si, Gyeonggi-do 435-050 / KR | 02 /
AN, Byung Sun 404-601 Pureun-maeul Apt. Sa-dong, Sangnok-gu Ansan-si, Gyeonggi-do 426-170 / KR | [2009/11] | Representative(s) | Pulieri, Gianluca Antonio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria, 11 25122 Brescia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/11] | Pulieri, Gianluca Antonio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza dela Vittoria, 11 25122 Brescia / IT | Application number, filing date | 07747132.4 | 27.06.2007 | [2009/11] | WO2007KR03110 | Priority number, date | KR20060059004 | 29.06.2006 Original published format: KR 20060059004 | [2009/11] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008002069 | Date: | 03.01.2008 | Language: | KO | [2008/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2032318 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2032318 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B26B21/14 | [2009/11] | CPC: |
B26B21/225 (EP,US);
B26B21/14 (KR);
B26B21/24 (KR);
B26B21/4012 (EP,US);
B26B21/4068 (EP,US);
B26B21/52 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RASIERAPPARAT | [2009/11] | English: | SHAVER | [2009/11] | French: | RASOIR | [2009/11] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2008 | Translation filed | 29.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 30.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.08.2010 | BE | 04.08.2010 | CY | 04.08.2010 | CZ | 04.08.2010 | DK | 04.08.2010 | EE | 04.08.2010 | FI | 04.08.2010 | HU | 04.08.2010 | IT | 04.08.2010 | LT | 04.08.2010 | LV | 04.08.2010 | MT | 04.08.2010 | PL | 04.08.2010 | RO | 04.08.2010 | SE | 04.08.2010 | SI | 04.08.2010 | SK | 04.08.2010 | TR | 04.08.2010 | BG | 04.11.2010 | GR | 05.11.2010 | ES | 15.11.2010 | IS | 04.12.2010 | PT | 06.12.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
MT | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
TR | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
MT | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4621424 (JACOBSON CHESTER F [US]) [A] 1* column 3, lines 17-46; figures 1,2,5,7 *; | [XA]EP1531030 (KNOWLEDGE & MERCHANDISING INC [GB]) [X] 1,3 * paragraph [0024]; figures 4-9 * [A] 2 | International search | [A]US5010646 (NEAMTU NICOLAE [US]); | [A]US6311400 (HAWES CHRISTOPHER MARTIN [GB], et al); | [A]KR100461700B |