EP2168351 - METHOD OF PROVIDING A SERVICE THROUGH A USER EQUIPMENT UNIT IN AN IP MULTIMEDIA SUBSYSTEM TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK, INCLUDING A USER DATABASE SERVER, SERVICE POLICY SERVER AND APPLICATION SERVER FOR USE WITH SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2019/47] |
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOLDUS, Rogier, August, Caspar, Joseph Frankische Driehoek 29 NL-5052 BM Goirle / NL | 02 /
FREIRE, Emilio C/Estudio 8, 5C E-28012 Madrid / ES | [2010/13] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2019/47] |
Former [2010/13] | Mohsler, Gabriele, et al Ericsson GmbH Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | Application number, filing date | 07747342.9 | 22.06.2007 | [2010/13] | WO2007NL00160 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009002143 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2168351 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2168351 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
H04L65/1016 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L61/4588 (EP,US);
H04L65/1063 (EP,US);
H04L65/1073 (EP,US);
H04L65/1104 (EP,US);
H04L61/4557 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/47] |
Former [2010/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BEREITSTELLEN EINES DIENSTES DURCH EINE BENUTZERGERÄTEEINHEIT IN EINEM IP-MULTIMEDIASUBSYSTEM-TELEKOMMUNKATIONSNETZ EINSCHLIESSLICH EINES BENUTZERDATENBANKSERVERS, EINES DIENSTRICHTLINIENSERVERS UND EINES ANWENDUNGSSERVERS ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT DEM VERFAHREN | [2010/13] | English: | METHOD OF PROVIDING A SERVICE THROUGH A USER EQUIPMENT UNIT IN AN IP MULTIMEDIA SUBSYSTEM TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK, INCLUDING A USER DATABASE SERVER, SERVICE POLICY SERVER AND APPLICATION SERVER FOR USE WITH SAID METHOD | [2010/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FOURNITURE D'UN SERVICE PAR LE BIAIS D'UNE UNITÉ D'ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR DANS UN RÉSEAU DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATIONS DE SOUS-SYSTÈME MULTIMÉDIA IP, COMPRENANT UN SERVEUR DE BASE DE DONNÉES UTILISATEUR, UN SERVEUR DE RÈGLES DE SERVICE ET UN SERVEUR D'APPLICA | [2010/13] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 19.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.09.2018 | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.06.2007 | AT | 20.11.2019 | CY | 20.11.2019 | CZ | 20.11.2019 | DK | 20.11.2019 | EE | 20.11.2019 | ES | 20.11.2019 | FI | 20.11.2019 | IT | 20.11.2019 | LT | 20.11.2019 | LV | 20.11.2019 | MC | 20.11.2019 | MT | 20.11.2019 | NL | 20.11.2019 | PL | 20.11.2019 | RO | 20.11.2019 | SE | 20.11.2019 | SI | 20.11.2019 | SK | 20.11.2019 | TR | 20.11.2019 | BG | 20.02.2020 | GR | 21.02.2020 | IS | 20.03.2020 | PT | 12.04.2020 | IE | 22.06.2020 | LU | 22.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
TR | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
IE | 22.06.2020 | ||
LU | 22.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
IE | 22.06.2020 | ||
LU | 22.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
IE | 22.06.2020 | ||
LU | 22.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
LU | 22.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 20.11.2019 | |
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 20.11.2019 | |
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2007009498 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11,13-15,21,22 * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 14 * * page 4, line 2 - line 17 * * page 9, line 4 - page 10, line 10 * * page 11, line 5 - page 12, line 33; figure 3 * [Y] 4,12,16-20; | [Y]US2007067470 (AYERS JOHN I [US], et al) [Y] 4,12,16-20 * page 7, paragraph 73 - paragraph 78 *; | [A] - Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); IP Multimedia Subsystem (IMS) Sh interface; Signalling flows and message contents (3GPP TS 29.328 version 6.12.0 Release 6); ETSI TS 129 328, ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, (200612), ISSN 0000-0001, XP014036409 [A] 4,12,16-20 * page 15, paragraph 6.1.4 * * page 24, paragraph B.1.1 * | Examination | - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Core Network and Terminals; IP Multimedia (IM) Subsystem Cx and Dx interfaces; Signalling flows and message contents (Release 7)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 29.228, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070601), no. V7.6.0, pages 1 - 61, XP050372476 |