EP1933627 - PROOFING TOLERANT YEAST-LEAVENED DOUGH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSM Nederland B.V. Nienoord 13 1112 XE Diemen / NL | [2008/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRINKER, Eva-Maria Bevergerner Strasse 82 48429 Rheine / DE | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Kerstin Borgfelder Deich 17c 28357 Bremen / DE | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Swinkels, Bart Willem Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | Swinkels, Bart Willem Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 07747375.9 | 12.04.2007 | [2008/26] | WO2007NL50151 | Priority number, date | EP20060112567 | 12.04.2006 Original published format: EP 06112567 | EP20060112672 | 14.04.2006 Original published format: EP 06112672 | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007117145 | Date: | 18.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1933627 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1933627 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A21D8/04, A21D10/00, A21D10/02 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
A21D8/047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GÄRSTABILER HEFETEIG& x9; | [2008/32] | English: | PROOFING TOLERANT YEAST-LEAVENED DOUGH | [2008/26] | French: | PÂTE LEVÉE AVEC DE LA LEVURE RÉSISTANTE À LA LEVÉE EXCESSIVE | [2008/26] |
Former [2008/26] | GÄRSTABILER HEFEGESÄUERTER TEIG | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/26] | 14.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.06.2009 | CY | 17.06.2009 | CZ | 17.06.2009 | EE | 17.06.2009 | FI | 17.06.2009 | LT | 17.06.2009 | LV | 17.06.2009 | MT | 17.06.2009 | PL | 17.06.2009 | RO | 17.06.2009 | SI | 17.06.2009 | SK | 17.06.2009 | TR | 17.06.2009 | BG | 17.09.2009 | GR | 18.09.2009 | IS | 17.10.2009 | PT | 17.10.2009 | HU | 18.12.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
CY | 17.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
MT | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
GR | 18.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
HU | 18.12.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
CY | 17.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
MT | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
GR | 18.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
MT | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
GR | 18.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS58158180 (SUNTORY LTD) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [AD]FR2683123 (DASSOUX GEORGES [FR]) [AD] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2005073622 (GUMMA PREFECTURE) [A] 1-11* abstract *; | [AD] - MCKINNON C M ET AL, "WINE YEAST PREFERMENT FOR ENHANCING BREAD AROMA AND FLAVOR", CEREAL CHEMISTRY, AACC INTERNATIONAL, ST PAUL, MN, US, (199601), vol. 73, no. 1, ISSN 0009-0352, pages 45 - 50, XP000554597 [AD] 1-11 * the whole document * |