EP2027753 - ELECTRIC HEATING DEVICE WITH TEMPERATURE DETECTION THROUGH DIELECTRIC LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferro Techniek Holding B.V. Bremstraat 1 7011 AT Gaanderen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Ferro Techniek Holding B.V. Bremstraat 1 NL-7011 AT Gaanderen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAASTRA, Simon Koendersweg 2 NL-7091 HV Dinxperlo / NL | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Cross, James Peter Archibald, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Cross, James Peter Archibald, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/09] | Langenhuijsen, Bastiaan Wilhelmus Herman, et al Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | Application number, filing date | 07747463.3 | 23.05.2007 | [2009/09] | WO2007NL50240 | Priority number, date | NL20062000081 | 23.05.2006 Original published format: NL 2000081 | [2009/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007136268 | Date: | 29.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2027753 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H05B1/02, H05B3/26, H05B3/74 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
H05B3/26 (EP);
H05B1/0269 (EP);
H05B1/0294 (EP);
H05B3/82 (EP);
A47J27/21075 (EP);
H05B2203/021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE HEIZVORRICHTUNG MIT TEMPERATURERFASSUNG DURCH EINE DIELEKTRISCHE SCHICHT | [2009/09] | English: | ELECTRIC HEATING DEVICE WITH TEMPERATURE DETECTION THROUGH DIELECTRIC LAYER | [2009/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE ÉLECTRIQUE PRÉSENTANT UNE ÉLECTRODE DE DÉTECTION DE TEMPÉRATURE FAISANT INTERVENIR LA COUCHE DIÉLECTRIQUE POUR DÉTECTER LA TEMPÉRATURE | [2009/09] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 31.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/35] | 12.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.10.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.2009 | 31.05.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005145617 (MCMILLIN JAMES [US] ET AL) [X] 1-5,8,9 * paragraphs [0028] , [0040] , [0042] , [0043]; figures 7a,8 *; | [X]WO02096155 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]; VAN DER WOUDE RENE H [NL]; DE HAA) [X] 1,2,6,7 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 25; figures 1-5 *; | [X]GB2272619 (CENTRAL RESEARCH LAB LTD [GB]) [X] 1,7 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 4, paragraph 3; figure 1 *; | [PX]WO2006083162 (FERRO TECHNIEK HOLDING B V [NL]; KAASTRA SIMON [NL]) [PX] 1,2 * page 12, line 15 - page 14, line 19; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO0167818 (FERRO TECH BV [NL]; KAASTRA SIMON [NL]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 27 - page 6, line 25; figures 2,3 * |