EP1937511 - LOCKING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Container Quick Lock Luxembourg S.A. 117, route d'Arlon 8009 Strassen Luxembourg / LU | [2009/41] |
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states Logi-d B.V. Obrechtstraat 40 bis 3572 EG Utrecht / NL | ||
For all designated states van Britsom, Rony Kapellenhoflaan 21 2980 Sint Antonius Zoersel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRIEN, Cornelis Gerardus Zuidzijdseweg 144 NL-3415 PS Polsbroek / NL | 02 /
VAN BRITSOM, Rony Kapellenhoflaan 21 2980 Sint Antonius Zoersel / BE | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Hatzmann, Martin, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [2013/43] |
Former [2008/27] | Hatzmann, Martin, et al VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 07747502.8 | 11.06.2007 | [2008/27] | WO2007NL50279 | Priority number, date | NL20061031973 | 09.06.2006 Original published format: NL 1031973 | [2008/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007142531 | Date: | 13.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1937511 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1937511 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1937511 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | [2009/43] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1937511 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60P7/13, B65D90/00 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
B60P7/13 (EP,KR,US);
B60P7/00 (KR);
B61D5/08 (KR);
B65D90/0006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/27] | Title | German: | SPERRVORRICHTUNG | [2008/27] | English: | LOCKING DEVICE | [2008/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE | [2008/27] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 24.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.05.2010
02.06.2010
ADMISSIBLE R.E.A. Patente GmbH & Co. KG Feldscheide 2 24814 Sehestedt / DE Opponent's representative Stüven, Ralf RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Kirchenhang 32b 21073 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.05.2010
02.06.2010
ADMISSIBLE R.E.A. Patente GmbH & Co. KG Feldscheide 2 24814 Sehestedt / DE Opponent's representative Stüven, Ralf Pohl & Partner Patentanwälte Kirchenhang 32 b 21073 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2013/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.05.2010
02.06.2010
ADMISSIBLE R.E.A. Patente GmbH & Co. KG Feldscheide 2 24814 Sehestedt / DE | ||
Former [2012/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.05.2010
02.06.2010
ADMISSIBLE 1. RMM Entwicklungsgesellschaft mbH & Co. KG Müllerstrasse 10 21244 Buchholz i.d.N. / DE Opponent's representative Hansen, Jochen Patentanwaltskanzlei Hansen Eisenbahnstrasse 5 21680 Stade / DE | ||
Former [2010/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.05.2010
RMM Entwicklungsgesellschaft mbH & Co. KG Müllerstraße 10 21244 Buchholz / DE Opponent's representative Hansen, Jochen Patentanwaltskanzlei Hansen Eisenbahnstrasse 5 21680 Stade / DE | 02.07.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.12.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.12.2011 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.12.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.05.2013 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 12.09.2013 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 29.02.2012 | Appeal received No. T0459/12 | 02.05.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.05.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 01.03.2012 | Appeal received No. T0459/12 | 30.10.2012 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2012/44] | 09.01.2013 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2013/02] | 08.05.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 08.05.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.05.2013 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.08.2009 | CY | 26.08.2009 | EE | 26.08.2009 | LT | 26.08.2009 | MT | 26.08.2009 | PL | 26.08.2009 | IS | 26.12.2009 | LU | 11.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | CH | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | CZ | 11.06.2012 | FI | 11.06.2012 | RO | 11.06.2012 | SK | 11.06.2012 | HU | 12.06.2012 | SI | 12.06.2012 | BG | 30.06.2012 | LV | 30.06.2012 | [2018/17] |
Former [2016/35] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
MT | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
LU | 11.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2012 | ||
FI | 11.06.2012 | ||
RO | 11.06.2012 | ||
SK | 11.06.2012 | ||
HU | 12.06.2012 | ||
SI | 12.06.2012 | ||
BG | 30.06.2012 | ||
LV | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2015/29] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
MT | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
LU | 11.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2012 | ||
FI | 11.06.2012 | ||
RO | 11.06.2012 | ||
SK | 11.06.2012 | ||
HU | 12.06.2012 | ||
SI | 12.06.2012 | ||
BG | 30.06.2012 | ||
LV | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
MT | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
LU | 11.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2012 | ||
FI | 11.06.2012 | ||
LV | 11.06.2012 | ||
RO | 11.06.2012 | ||
SK | 11.06.2012 | ||
HU | 12.06.2012 | ||
SI | 12.06.2012 | ||
BG | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
MT | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
LU | 11.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2012 | ||
FI | 11.06.2012 | ||
RO | 11.06.2012 | ||
SK | 11.06.2012 | ||
HU | 12.06.2012 | ||
SI | 12.06.2012 | ||
BG | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
MT | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
LU | 11.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2012 | ||
FI | 11.06.2012 | ||
RO | 11.06.2012 | ||
SK | 11.06.2012 | ||
HU | 12.06.2012 | ||
SI | 12.06.2012 | ||
PT | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
MT | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
LU | 11.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2012 | ||
FI | 11.06.2012 | ||
RO | 11.06.2012 | ||
SK | 11.06.2012 | ||
HU | 12.06.2012 | ||
SI | 12.06.2012 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
MT | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
LU | 11.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2012 | ||
FI | 11.06.2012 | ||
LV | 11.06.2012 | ||
RO | 11.06.2012 | ||
SK | 11.06.2012 | ||
HU | 12.06.2012 | ||
SI | 12.06.2012 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
Former [2011/41] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
MT | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
MT | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
IT | 11.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1260364 (BLAIR PRODUCTS S A [CH]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 52 - page 3, line 49; figure - *; | [A]US5020947 (MARCELIUS PETER [SE]); | [XA]EP0507010 (KOSANOVIC MILORAD [NL], et al) [X] 1-7,9-12,16 * column 4, line 43 - column 7, line 45; figure - * [A] 8,13; | [X]US5613814 (JACKSON ROBERT G [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * | Opposition | WO0176980 | WO2004045904 | EP1800946 |