EP2150649 - CELLULOSE FIBRE TEXTILES CONTAINING NANOLIGNINS, A METHOD OF APPLYING NANOLIGNINS ONTO TEXTILES AND THE USE OF NANOLIGNINS IN TEXTILE PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institute of Natural Fibres and Medicinal Plants ul. Wojska Polskiego 71B 60-630 Poznan / PL | [2010/14] |
Former [2010/06] | For all designated states Instytut Wlokien Naturalnych (Institut of Natural Fibres) Ul. Wojska Polskiego 71 b 60-630 - / PL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOZLOWSKI, Ryszard ul. Maków Polnych 4 PL-61-606 Poznan / PL | 02 /
ZIMNIEWSKA, Malgorzata ul. Skladowa 28 Pl-62-081 Przezmierowo / PL | 03 /
BATOG, Jolanta ul. Gostynska 64 PL-60-103 Poznan / PL | [2010/06] | Representative(s) | Rzazewska, Dorota, et al JWP Rzecznicy Patentowi Dorota Rzazewska sp.k. Sienna Center ul. Zelazna 28/30 00-833 Warszawa / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/33] | Rzazewska, Dorota, et al JWP Rzecznicy Patentowi Dorota Rzazewska sp.j. Sienna Center Ul. Zelazna 28/30 00-833 Warszawa / PL | ||
Former [2010/14] | Twardowska, Aleksandra, et al Jan Wierzchon & Partners Patent and Trademark Attorneys Ul. Zurawia 47/49 00-680 Warszawa / PL | Application number, filing date | 07747735.4 | 09.05.2007 | [2010/06] | WO2007PL00025 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008140337 | Date: | 20.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2150649 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2150649 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | D06M15/17 | [2010/06] | CPC: |
C08L97/005 (EP);
C09D197/005 (EP);
D06M15/17 (EP);
D06M15/3568 (EP);
D06M15/41 (EP);
D06M15/643 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/06] | Title | German: | CELLULOSEFASERTEXTILIEN MIT GEHALT AN NANOLIGNINEN, VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBRINGEN VON NANOLIGNINEN AUF TEXTILIEN UND VERWENDUNG VON NANOLIGNINEN BEI DER TEXTILHERSTELLUNG | [2010/06] | English: | CELLULOSE FIBRE TEXTILES CONTAINING NANOLIGNINS, A METHOD OF APPLYING NANOLIGNINS ONTO TEXTILES AND THE USE OF NANOLIGNINS IN TEXTILE PRODUCTION | [2010/06] | French: | TEXTILES EN FIBRES DE CELLULOSE CONTENANT DES NANOLIGNINES, PROCÉDÉ D'APPLICATION DE NANOLIGNINES SUR DES TEXTILES ET UTILISATION DE NANOLIGNINES DANS LA PRODUCTION TEXTILE | [2010/06] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 08.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 26.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/34] | Request for further processing for: | 08.03.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 08.03.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 08.03.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 08.03.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.05.2007 | AT | 12.09.2012 | CY | 12.09.2012 | CZ | 12.09.2012 | DK | 12.09.2012 | EE | 12.09.2012 | FI | 12.09.2012 | LT | 12.09.2012 | LV | 12.09.2012 | MC | 12.09.2012 | MT | 12.09.2012 | NL | 12.09.2012 | RO | 12.09.2012 | SE | 12.09.2012 | SI | 12.09.2012 | SK | 12.09.2012 | TR | 12.09.2012 | BG | 12.12.2012 | GR | 13.12.2012 | IS | 12.01.2013 | PT | 14.01.2013 | GB | 09.05.2013 | IE | 09.05.2013 | LU | 09.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 12.09.2012 | ||
MT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
TR | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
GB | 09.05.2013 | ||
IE | 09.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 12.09.2012 | ||
MT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
GB | 09.05.2013 | ||
IE | 09.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
GB | 09.05.2013 | ||
IE | 09.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
IE | 09.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 12.09.2012 | |
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 12.09.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XA]GB656610 (KERMATEX LTD) [X] 1,3 * page 1, line 78 - page 2, line 2; example 1 * [A] 2,4-9; | [XA]EP0445076 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 10-13 * page 4, lines 5-15; examples 1-B * * page 9; claim 8 * [A] 1-9 | by applicant | GB656610 | EP0445076 | CA2506108 | DE202006010168U | KR20040011069 | CN1676686 | US2003127633 | TW577943B | US5914444 | US5938793 | EP0717140 | US5700295 | US5786475 | JPH08113819 | WO03046273 | CN1123349 | KR20020006059 | DE10343308 | CA2274819 | - I. ABREU H.S.; NASCIMENTO A.M.; MARIA M.A., "Lignin structure and wood properties", WOOD AND FIBRES SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 31, no. 4, pages 426 - 433 | - "Sun protective clothing -. Evaluation and classification", AUSTRALIAN/ NEW ZEALAND STANDARD AS/NZS, (1996), page 399 | - CREWS P.C.; KACHMAN S.; BEYER A.G., "Influences on UVR Transmission of Undyed Woven Fabrics Textile Chemist and Colorist", TEXT. CHEM. COLOR., (1999), vol. 31, no. 6, pages 17 - 26 | - GAMBICHLER T.; ALTMEYER P.; HOFFMANN K., "Role of clothes in sun protection", RECENT RESULTS CANCER RES., (2002), vol. 160, pages 15 - 25 | - GAMBICHLER T.; AVENNAETE A.; BADER A.; ALTMEYER P.; HOFFMANN K., "Ultraviolet protection by summer textiles. Ultraviolet transmission measurements verified by determination of the minimal erythema dose with solar-simulated radiation", BR J DERMATOL, (200103), vol. 144, no. 3, pages 484 - 9 | - GAMBICHLER T.; HATCH K.L.; AVENNAETE A.; ALTMEYER P.; HOFFMANN K., "Influence of wetness on the ultraviolet protection factor (UPF) of textiles: in vitro and in vivo measurements", PHATODERMATOL PHOTOIMMUNOL PHOTOMED., (200202), vol. 18, no. 1, pages 29 - 35 | - GIES P.H.; ROY C.R.; TOOMEY S.; MCLENNAN A., "Protection against solar ultraviolet radiation", MUTAT_RES., (19981109), vol. 422, no. 1, pages 15 - 22 | - JOHN LOY, "the CEO of ARPANSA", AUSTRALIAN RADIATION PROTECTION AND NUCLEAR SAFETY AGENCY | - Development in the Field of UV Protection of Textiles, DR. DEEPTI OUPTA DEPARTMENT OF TEXTILE TECHNOLOGY INDIAN INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY |