EP2014390 - FOUR-DIE FORGING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otkryetoe Aktsionernoe Obschestvo "Tjazhpressmash" Ul. Promyshlennaya 5 Ryazan 390042 / RU | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOLODIN Alexei Mikhailovich ul. Zapadnaya, 12-5-3 Ryazan, 390044 / RU | 02 /
LAZORKIN, Viktor Andreevich ul. Zadneprovskaya, 16a-100 Zaporozhye, 69097 / UA | 03 /
PETROV, Nikollai Pavlovich ul. Moskovskoe shosse, 45-2-100 Ryazan, 390044 / RU | 04 /
NIKITIN, Vasilii Vasilevich ul. Biryuzova, 29-1-60 Ryazan, 390039 / RU | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Jeck, Anton Jeck, Fleck & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Jeck, Anton Jeck - Fleck - Herrmann Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2/1 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | ||
Former [2009/03] | Jeck, Anton Jeck - Fleck - Hermann Klingengasse 2/1 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | Application number, filing date | 07747785.9 | 24.01.2007 | [2009/03] | WO2007RU00029 | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008091176 | Date: | 31.07.2008 | Language: | RU | [2008/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2014390 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2014390 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 31.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B21J13/02, B21J7/16, B21J7/14 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
B21J7/14 (EP);
B21J13/02 (KR);
B21J13/03 (EP);
B21J3/00 (KR);
B21J7/16 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2009/03] | B21J13/02, B21J7/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VIERBACKEN-SCHMIEDEVORRICHTUNG | [2009/44] | English: | FOUR-DIE FORGING DEVICE | [2009/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FORGEAGE À QUATRE PERCUTEURS | [2009/03] |
Former [2009/03] | SCHMIEDEPRODUKT MIT VIER GESENKEN | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2008 | Translation filed | 17.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 19.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.03.2010 | CZ | 24.03.2010 | DK | 24.03.2010 | EE | 24.03.2010 | FI | 24.03.2010 | HU | 24.03.2010 | IE | 24.03.2010 | LT | 24.03.2010 | LV | 24.03.2010 | NL | 24.03.2010 | PL | 24.03.2010 | RO | 24.03.2010 | SE | 24.03.2010 | SI | 24.03.2010 | SK | 24.03.2010 | TR | 24.03.2010 | BG | 24.06.2010 | GR | 25.06.2010 | IS | 24.07.2010 | PT | 26.07.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 24.03.2010 | |
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
TR | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 24.03.2010 | |
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CZ | 24.03.2010 | |
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | FI | 24.03.2010 | |
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | FI | 24.03.2010 | |
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US3670556 (KRALOWETZ BRUNO); | [A]UA67879 (LAZORKIN VIKTOR ANDRIIOVYCH [UA]); | [A]RU2242322 ; | [A]RU2257278 |