EP2013132 - SAFETY LOCKING DEVICE FOR A LIFTING HOOK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liko Research & Development AB Nedre Vägen 100 975 92 Luleå / SE | [2013/11] |
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states Liko Research & Development AB Nedre vägen 100 975 92 Lulea / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LILJEDAHL, Gunnar Pellvägen 4 S-975 93 Luleå / SE | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Janson, Ronny Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyrå AB Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | Janson, Ronny Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyrå AB Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2009/03] | Janson, Ronny Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyrå AB Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 07748044.0 | 20.04.2007 | [2009/03] | WO2007SE00379 | Priority number, date | SE20060000973 | 03.05.2006 Original published format: SE 0600973 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007126355 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2013132 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2013132 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 08.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B66C1/36, F16B45/02, A61G7/10 | [2010/37] | CPC: |
B66C1/36 (EP,SE,US);
F16B45/02 (EP);
F16B45/036 (US);
A61G7/1078 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/03] | B66C1/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2009/23] |
Former [2009/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSSPERRE FÜR EINEN LASTHAKEN | [2009/03] | English: | SAFETY LOCKING DEVICE FOR A LIFTING HOOK | [2009/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE DE SÉCURITÉ POUR CROCHET DE LEVAGE | [2009/03] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 04.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB1368427 (SIEBE GORMAN & CO LTD); | [A]GB2192926 (R W O); | [A]US4908913 (MORI TOMOHIRO [JP]); | [XAYI]JPH10318242 (FURUTA TETSUYA); | [A]EP1052417 (YKK CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]SE50291 ; | [A]FR741573 ; | [A]DE668343 (PETER SCHOETTLER FA); | [A]GB1368427 (SIEBE GORMAN & CO LTD); | [E]JP2006153159 (MARUZEN SEISAKUSHO KK) | by applicant | GB2192926 | US4908913 | JPH10318242 | EP1052417 |