06.12.2013 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] |
03.09.2013 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.03.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.07.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] |
25.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.02.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.11.2009 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
20.11.2009 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
18.11.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.09.2009 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.05.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.01.2009 |
First examination report |
|
21.01.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.01.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.12.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.11.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
21.11.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
16.10.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.10.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.09.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.09.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.11.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.11.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|