EP1977103 - MIXING UNIT FOR LOW PRESSURE-EGR CONDENSATE INTO THE COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BorgWarner, Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2872 / US | [2008/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Joergl, Volker 1601 N. Hadley Road Ortonville, MI 48462 / US | 02 /
Kiener, Timm 291 Schorn Road Lake Orion, MI 48362 / US | 03 /
Weber, Olaf 5819 Raven Road Bloomfield Hills, MI 48301 / US | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Hans-Werner Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Schmitz, Hans-Werner Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07749262.7 | 26.01.2007 | [2008/41] | WO2007US02140 | Priority number, date | US20060762664P | 27.01.2006 Original published format: US 762664 P | [2008/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007089565 | Date: | 09.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1977103 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/07 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
F02B37/00 (KR);
F02M26/06 (EP,US);
F02M26/19 (EP,US);
F02M26/35 (EP,US);
F02M26/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MISCHEINHEIT FÜR EIN NIEDRIGDRUCK-EGR-KONDENSAT IN EINEM KONDENSATOR | [2008/41] | English: | MIXING UNIT FOR LOW PRESSURE-EGR CONDENSATE INTO THE COMPRESSOR | [2008/41] | French: | UNITÉ DE MÉLANGE PERMETTANT DE RÉINTRODUIRE UN CONDENSAT DE RECYCLAGE DES GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT À BASSE PRESSION DANS LE COMPRESSEUR | [2008/41] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 27.01.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6886544 (BUI YUNG T [US]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * column 4, line 19 - column 6, line 60 *; | [XA]WO2004007925 (CLEAN AIR PARTNERS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,7-9,13,14 * abstract * * page 12, line 16 - page 13, line 13 * * page 14, line 9 - line 16 * * page 15, line 13 - page 16, line 17 * [A] 4-6,10-12,15,16; | [XA]JPS57159950 (AISIN SEIKI) [X] 9 * abstract * [A] 1-8,10-16; | [A]JPH03290051 (HINO MOTORS LTD) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]DE10303569 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1,9,13 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 19 - page 4, paragraph 25 *; | [A]DE10019409 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1,9,13 * abstract * * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 32 *; | [A]DE19945769 (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER [DE]) [A] 1,9,13 * abstract * * column 1, line 57 - line 63 * * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 36 * |