EP1991593 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING HIGH MELT STRENGTH POLYPROPYLENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novolen Technology Holdings, C.V. Oostduinlaan 75 2596 JJ Gravenhage / NL | [2008/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAVRIDIS, Harilaos 9943 Hunters Place Cincinnati, OH 45249 / US | 02 /
SHANKERNARAYNAN, Manivakkam J. 9397 Bainwoods Drive Cincinnati, OH 45249 / US | [2008/47] | Representative(s) | Thoma, Michael, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | Thoma, Michael, et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07749757.6 | 02.02.2007 | [2008/47] | WO2007US02810 | Priority number, date | US20060363018 | 27.02.2006 Original published format: US 363018 | [2008/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007100436 | Date: | 07.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1991593 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/06 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
C08F10/06 (EP,US);
C08L23/12 (EP,US);
C08F110/06 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C08L2205/025 (EP,US);
C08L2308/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/06, C08F2/001 (EP,US);
C08L23/12, C08L2666/06 (US,EP);
C08F110/06, C08F2500/11, C08F2500/05 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYPROPYLEN MIT HOHER SCHMELZFESTIGKEIT | [2008/47] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING HIGH MELT STRENGTH POLYPROPYLENE | [2008/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN POLYPROPYLÈNE À RÉSISTANCE ÉLEVÉE À LA FUSION | [2008/47] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 08.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 28.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9916797 (BOREALIS AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,2,7-18 * abstract * * page 7, line 15 - page 8 *; | [X]EP1026198 (GRAND POLYMER CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-20 * abstract ** page 5, paragraph 35 *; | [XA]US2003065097 (DEGROOT ALEXANDER W [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * the whole document * [A] 19,20; | [X]US6723795 (DUPIRE MARC [BE], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 14 * * column 3, lines 30-35 * * table 1 * |