EP1989220 - HIV FUSION INHIBITOR PEPTIDES WITH IMPROVED BIOLOGICAL PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synageva BioPharma Corp. 128 Spring Street, Suite 520 Lexington, MA 02421 / US | [2012/17] |
Former [2011/12] | For all designated states Trimeris, Inc. 2530 Meridian Parkway, 2nd Floor Durham, NC 27713 / US | ||
Former [2008/46] | For all designated states Trimeris, Inc. 3500 Paramount Way Morrisville, NC 27560 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DWYER, John 102 Buck Taylor Trail Chapel Hill, NC 27516 / US | 02 /
BRAY, Brian, L. 1912 Broadway Drive Graham, NC 27253 / US | 03 /
SCHNEIDER, Stephen, E. 7405 Baystone Court Raleigh, NC 27615Raleigh, NC 27615 / US | 04 /
ZHANG, Huyi 604 Chancellors Ridge Dr. Durham, NC 27713 / US | 05 /
TVERMOES, Nicolai, A. 6921 Calais Drive Durham, NC 27712 / US | 06 /
JOHNSTON, Barbara, E. 6436 E. Lake Anne Drive Raleigh, NC 27612 / US | 07 /
FRIEDRICH, Paul, E. 4208 Wyckford Place Apex, NC 27539 / US | [2011/49] |
Former [2011/12] | 01 /
DWYER, John 102 Buck Taylor Trail Chapel Hill, NC 27516 / US | ||
02 /
BRAY, Brian, L. 1912 Broadway Drive Graham, NC 27253 / US | |||
03 /
SCHNEIDER, Stephen, E. 7405 Baystone Court Raleigh, NC 27615 / US | |||
04 /
ZHANG, Huyi 604 Chancellors Ridge Dr. Durham, NC 27713 / US | |||
05 /
TVERMOES, Nicolai, A. 6921 Calais Drive Durham, NC 27712 / US | |||
06 /
JOHNSTON, Barbara, E. 6436 E. Lake Anne Drive Raleigh, NC 27612 / US | |||
07 /
FRIEDRICH, Paul, E. 4208 Wyckford Place Apex, NC 27539 / US | |||
Former [2008/46] | 01 /
DWYER, John 102 Buck Taylor Trail Chapel Hill, NC 27516 / US | ||
02 /
BRAY, Brian, L. 1912 Broadway Drive Graham, NC 27253 / US | |||
03 /
SCHNEIDER, Stephen, E. 7612 Harps Mill Road Raleigh, NC 27615 / US | |||
04 /
ZHANG, Huyi 604 Chancellors Ridge Dr. Durham, NC 27713 / US | |||
05 /
TVERMOES, Nicolai, A. 6921 Calais Drive Durham, NC 27712 / US | |||
06 /
JOHNSTON, Barbara, E. 6436 E. Lake Anne Drive Raleigh, NC 27612 / US | |||
07 /
FRIEDRICH, Paul, E. 4208 Wyckford Place Apex, NC 27539 / US | Representative(s) | Weber, Martin, et al Jones Day Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Weber-Quitzau, Martin, et al Jones Day Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07749903.6 | 02.02.2007 | [2008/46] | WO2007US02990 | Priority number, date | US20060764674P | 02.02.2006 Original published format: US 764674 P | [2008/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007097903 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1989220 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1989220 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/16 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C12N2740/16022 (EP,US);
C12N2740/16122 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/46] | C07K5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/46] | Extension states | AL | 25.08.2008 | BA | 25.08.2008 | HR | 25.08.2008 | MK | 25.08.2008 | RS | 25.08.2008 | Title | German: | HIV-FUSIONSHEMMERPEPTIDE MIT VERBESSERTEN BIOLOGISCHEN EIGENSCHAFTEN | [2008/46] | English: | HIV FUSION INHIBITOR PEPTIDES WITH IMPROVED BIOLOGICAL PROPERTIES | [2008/46] | French: | PEPTIDES INHIBITEURS DE FUSION DU VIH À PROPRIÉTÉS BIOLOGIQUES AMÉLIORÉES | [2008/46] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/46] | 23.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.02.2007 | CZ | 14.12.2011 | EE | 14.12.2011 | LT | 14.12.2011 | LV | 14.12.2011 | PL | 14.12.2011 | RO | 14.12.2011 | SI | 14.12.2011 | SK | 14.12.2011 | TR | 14.12.2011 | BG | 14.03.2012 | IS | 14.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CZ | 14.12.2011 | |
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
TR | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CZ | 14.12.2011 | |
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CZ | 14.12.2011 | |
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CZ | 14.12.2011 | |
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CZ | 14.12.2011 | |
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | LT | 14.12.2011 | |
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 14.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005067960 (TRIMERIS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-35 * page 7, line 11 - line 31*; page 3, line 35 - page 5, line 33; claims 1-34; sequences 51,54,92 *; | [X]WO2005089796 (TRIMERIS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-35 * page 4 - page 8; claims 1-34; sequences 133, 170 *; | [PX]US2006247416 (DELMEDICO MARY K [US], et al) [PX] 1-35* claims 1-66; sequence 97 *; | [A] - GALLO S A ET AL, "The HIV Env-mediated fusion reaction", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA. BIOMEMBRANES, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20030711), vol. 1614, no. 1, ISSN 0005-2736, pages 36 - 50, XP004438798 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0005-2736(03)00161-5 | [A] - LIU ET AL, "An artificial HIV enhancer-binding peptide is dimerized by the addition of a leucine zipper", EUROPEAN BIOPHYSICS JOURNAL, SPRINGER, TOKYO, JP, (19970101), vol. 25, no. 5/06, ISSN 0175-7571, pages 399 - 403, XP002091419 [A] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002490050052 | [A] - JOYCE JG ET AL., "Enhancement of .alpha.-Helicity in the HIV-1 Inhibitory Peptide DP178 Leads to an Increased Affinity for Human Monoclonal Antibody 2F5 but Does Not Elicit Neutralizing Responses in Vitro", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20021129), vol. 277, no. 48, pages 45811 - 45820, XP002520853 [A] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/JBC.M205862200 | International search | [A] - LALEZARI ET AL., "Enfuvirtide, an HIV-1 Fusion Inhibitor, for Drug-Resistant HIV Infection in North and South America", N. ENGL. J. MED., (2003), pages 1 - 10, XP008130410 | [A] - EXPERT OPIN. THER. PATENTS, (2004), vol. 14, no. 5, pages 733 - 748, XP008130208 | by applicant | US6258782 | WO2005067960 | - KILBY ET AL., NATURE MED., (1998), vol. 4, pages 1302 - 1307 | - MELBY ET AL., AIDS RESEARCH AND HUMAN RETROVIRUSES, (2006), vol. 22, no. 5, pages 375 - 385 | - GREENBERG; CAMMACK, J. ANTIMICROBIAL CHEMOTHERAPY, (2004), vol. 54, pages 333 - 340 | - SISTA ET AL., AIDS, (2004), vol. 18, pages 1787 - 1794 |