EP1994043 - PHOSPHATASE INHIBITOR PROTEIN-1 AS A REGULATOR OF CARDIAC FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Cincinnati Dept. of Pharmacology and Cell Biophysics University of Cincinnati College of Medicine Cincinnati OH 45267-0575 / US | [2008/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRANIAS, Evangelia 5890 Park Road Cincinnati, OH 45243 / US | 02 /
RODRIGUEZ, Patricia 236 Loraine Avenue 1 Cincinnati, OH 45220 / US | 03 /
MITTON, Bryan 765 Weyburn Place No.67 Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/48] | 01 /
KRANIAS, Evangelia 5890 Park Road Cincinnati, OH 45243 / US | ||
02 /
RODRIGUEZ, Patricia 236 Loraine Avenue 1 Cincinnati, OH 45220 / US | |||
03 /
MITTON, Bryan 3827 Paxton Avenue 235 Cincinnati, OH 45209 / US | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstraße 4 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07750317.5 | 09.02.2007 | [2008/48] | WO2007US03470 | Priority number, date | US20060772327P | 10.02.2006 Original published format: US 772327 P | [2008/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007100465 | Date: | 07.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1994043 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/02 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
C07K14/4703 (EP,US);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/48] | Title | German: | PHOSPHATASEHEMMER-PROTEIN 1 ALS REGULATOR DER HERZFUNKTION | [2008/48] | English: | PHOSPHATASE INHIBITOR PROTEIN-1 AS A REGULATOR OF CARDIAC FUNCTION | [2008/48] | French: | PROTÉINE-A INHIBITEUR DE PHOSPHATASE EN TANT QUE RÉGULATEUR DE LA FONCTION CARDIAQUE | [2008/48] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 08.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 23.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/48] | 19.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/48] | Divisional application(s) | EP11181884.5 / EP2441770 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.09.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.05.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 25.05.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.06.2012 | Decision despatched | 02.02.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 05.03.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - BIBB J A ET AL, "Phosphorylation of Protein Phosphatase Inhibitor-1 by Cdk5", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY 20010427 AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY INC. US, (20010427), vol. 276, no. 17, pages 14490 - 14497, XP002522737 [X] 11,12 * page 14493 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M007197200 | [A] - HUANG KE-XUE ET AL, "Ser67-phosphorylated inhibitor 1 is a potent protein phosphatase 1 inhibitor", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (20000523), vol. 97, no. 11, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5824 - 5829, XP002522738 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.100460897 | [A] - BRAZ J C ET AL, "PKC-ALPHA REGULATES CARDIAC CONTRACTILITY AND PROPENSITY TOWARD HEART FAILURE", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20040301), vol. 10, no. 3, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 248 - 254, XP008049092 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm1000 | [T] - RODRIGUEZ P ET AL, "Identification of a novel phosphorylation site in protein phosphatase inhibitor-1 as a negative regulator of cardiac function", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY 20061215 AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY INC. US, (20061215), vol. 281, no. 50, pages 38599 - 38608, XP002522739 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/JBC.M604139200 | [T] - RODRIGUEZ PATRICIA ET AL, "Phosphorylation of human inhibitor-1 at Ser67 and/or Thr75 attenuates stimulatory effects of protein kinase A signaling in cardiac myocytes", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY - HEART AND CIRCULATORY PHYSIOLOGY, (200707), vol. 293, no. 1, ISSN 0363-6135, pages H762 - H769, XP002522740 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/AJPHEART.00104.2007 | International search | [X] - ENDO ET AL., "Multiple structural elements define the specificity of recombinant human inhibitor-1 as a protein phosphatase-1 inhibitor", GENBANK, Database accession no. (HSU48707), XP003023456 | [ ] - BIOCHEMISTRY, (19960423), vol. 35, no. 16, pages 5220 - 5228 |