EP2079697 - MULTI-SUBSTITUTED PYRIDYL SULFOXIMINES AND THEIR USE AS INSECTICIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow AgroSciences LLC 9330 Zionsville Road Indianapolis IN 46268-1054 / US | [2009/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Yuanming 12514 Spring Violet Place Carmel, IN 46033 / US | 02 /
LOSO, Michael R. 11439 Sutton Place Drive Carmel, IN 46032 / US | 03 /
NUGENT, Benjamin M. 5325 Michael Court Brownsburg, IN 46112 / US | 04 /
HUANG, Jim X. 1538 Old Mill Circle Carmel, IN 46032 / US | 05 /
ROGERS, Richard B. 250 Saint Anthony Street Mobile, AL 36603 / US | [2009/40] |
Former [2009/30] | 01 /
ZHU, Yuanming 13209 Aquamarine Drive Carmel, IN 46033 / US | ||
02 /
LOSO, Michael R. 11439 Sutton Place Drive Carmel, IN 46032 / US | |||
03 /
NUGENT, Benjamin M. 5325 Michael Court Brownsburg, IN 46112 / US | |||
04 /
HUANG, Jim X. 1538 Old Mill Circle Carmel, IN 46032 / US | |||
05 /
ROGERS, Richard B. 250 Saint Anthony Street Mobile, AL 36603 / US | Representative(s) | Dey, Michael, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Dey, Michael, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/30] | Dey, Michael, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07750607.9 | 09.02.2007 | [2009/30] | WO2007US03780 | Priority number, date | US20060857611P | 08.11.2006 Original published format: US 857611 P | [2009/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008057129 | Date: | 15.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2079697 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2079697 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/61, C07D213/65, C07D213/70 | [2009/30] | CPC: |
C07D213/61 (EP,KR,US);
C07D213/70 (EP,KR,US);
A61P33/14 (EP);
C07D213/65 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, IT [2011/16] |
Former [2009/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRFACHSUBSTITUIERTE PYRIDYLSULFOXIMINE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS INSEKTIZIDE | [2009/30] | English: | MULTI-SUBSTITUTED PYRIDYL SULFOXIMINES AND THEIR USE AS INSECTICIDES | [2009/30] | French: | SULFOXIMINES PYRIDYLES MULTISUBSTITUÉES ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QU'INSECTICIDES | [2009/30] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 17.07.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.06.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2014/14] |
Former [2014/03] | IT | 09.02.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2006060029 (DOW AGROSCIENCES LLC [US]) [XY] 1-9 * examples I-X; claims 1-8; tables 1-6 *; | [Y]GB1307271 (SHELL INT RESEARCH) [Y] 1-9 * example 2; tables 1-3,5 *; | [XD]US2005228027 (ZHU YUANMING [US], et al) [XD] 1-9 * the whole document * |