EP1991623 - LOW FOAMING PVOH AEROSOL SPRAY COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sekisui Specialty Chemicals America, LLC 1603 West LBJ Highway Dallas, TX 75234 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | For all designated states Sekisui Specialty Chemicals America, LLC 1603 West LBJ Highway Dallas, TX 75243 / US | ||
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Celanese International Corporation 1601 West LBJ Freeway Dallas, TX 75234-6034 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMBERT, Georgia, Lynn 11003 N Avenue H La Porte, TX 77571-9126 / US | 02 /
PALMER, Darin, Michael 5894 Ethan Drive Burlington, NY 41005 / US | 03 /
ROMERO-NOCHEBUENA, Eduardo 3803 Pinehurst Drive Pearland, TX 77581-8831 / US | 04 /
VICARI, Richard 2507 Sunny Shores Pearland, TX 77584-3163 / US | 05 /
YBARRA, Arnold, Jr. 205 Water Oak Drive League City, TX 77573-5207 / US | [2008/47] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/47] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07750779.6 | 15.02.2007 | [2008/47] | WO2007US03963 | Priority number, date | US20060358255 | 21.02.2006 Original published format: US 358255 | [2008/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007097977 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1991623 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1991623 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/00, C09G1/16 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
C09D5/008 (EP,US);
C09D129/04 (KR);
C09D5/021 (EP,US);
C09G1/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/14] |
Former [2008/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PVOH-SPRÜHBESCHICHTUNGEN MIT GERINGER SCHAUMBILDUNG | [2008/47] | English: | LOW FOAMING PVOH AEROSOL SPRAY COATINGS | [2008/47] | French: | REVETEMENTS PAR PULVERISATION D'AEROSOLS DE PVOH FORMANT PEU DE MOUSSE | [2008/47] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 22.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5550182 (ELY RICHARD W [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * column 2, lines 65-67 - column 3, lines 1-9 * * column 2, lines 45-56 * * examples 1,2 *; | [Y]US5750190 (WOODHALL EDWARD W [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * column 1, lines 18-20 * * column 6, lines 31-33 * * column 7, lines 60-67 * * column 8, lines 4-13 *; | [A]WO0160927 (HENKEL CORP [US]) [A] 1-22* the whole document *; | [Y]WO0170834 (ASHLAND INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * abstract * * page 7, paragraph 5 * * page 10, paragraph 2 * * page 14, paragraph 2 * * page 16, paragraph 3 * | by applicant | US1971951 | US2109883 | US5550182 | WO0160927 | - HAM, Vinyl Polymerization, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1967), vol. 1 | - SORENSON, CAMPBELL, Preparative Methods of Polymer Chemistry, INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, INC. |