EP1991887 - HIGH FIELD MAGNETIC RESONANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regents of the University of Minnesota 450 McNamara Alumni Center 200 Oak Street S.E. Minneapolis, MN 55455-2070 / US | [2014/38] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of Minnesota 1000 Westgate Drive, Suite 160 Saint Paul, MN 55114-8658 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAUGHAN, J. Thomas 504 South 5th Street Stillwater MN 55082 / US | 02 /
VAN DE MOORTELE, Pierre-Francois 2801 38th Avenue South Minneapolis MN 55406 / US | 03 /
DELABARRE, Lance 2516 Silver Lane Apt. 306 St. Anthony MN 55421 / US | 04 /
OLSON, Chris 1000 Westgate Drive Suite 160 St. Paul MN 55114-8658 / US | 05 /
ORSER, Heather 1000 Westgate Drive Suite 160 St. Paul MN 55114-8658 / US | 06 /
GOPINATH, Anand 1000 Westgate Drive Suite 160 St. Paul MN 55114-8658 / US | 07 /
UGURBIL, Kamil 2812 Benton Boulevard Minneapolis MN 55416 / US | 08 /
SNYDER, Carl 3701 Garfield Avenue South Apt. 205 Minneapolis MN 55409 / US | 09 /
ADRIANY, Gregor 139 S.e. Cecil Street Minneapolis MN 55414 / US | 10 /
AKGUN, Can E. 1414 Corral Lane Woodbury MN 55125 / US | 11 /
TIAN, Jinfeng 1026 27th Avenue SE Apt. F Minneapolis MN 55414 / US | 12 /
STRUPP, John 12767 Northwest Ibis Street Coon Rapids MN 55448 / US | 13 /
ANDERSON, Peter M. 2809 Louisiana Avenue St. Louis Park MN 55426 / US | 14 /
WU, Xiaoping 1000 Westgate Drive Suite 160 St. Paul MN 55114-8658 / US | [2018/42] |
Former [2008/47] | 01 /
VAUGHAN, J. Thomas 504 South 5th Street Stillwater MN 55082 / US | ||
02 /
VAN DE MOORTELE, Pierre-Francois 2801 38th Avenue South Minneapolis MN 55406 / US | |||
03 /
DELABARRE, Lance 2516 Silver Lane Apt. 306 St. Anthony MN 55421 / US | |||
04 /
OLSON, Chris 1000 Westgate Drive Suite 160 St. Paul MN 55114-8658 / US | |||
05 /
ORSER, Heather 1000 Westgate Drive Suite 160 St. Paul MN 55114-8658 / US | |||
06 /
GOPINATH, Anand 1000 Westgate Drive Suite 160 St. Paul MN 55114-8658 / US | |||
07 /
UGURBIL, Kamil 2812 Benton Boulevard Minneapolis MN 55416 / US | |||
08 /
SNYDER, Carl 3701 Garfield Avenue South Apt. 205 Minneapolis MN 55409 / US | |||
09 /
ADRIANY, Gregor 139 S.e. Cecil Street Minneapolis MN 55414 / US | |||
10 /
AKGUN, Can E. 1414 Corral Lane Woodbury MN 55125 / US | |||
11 /
TIAN, Jinfeng 1026 27th Avenue SE Apt. F Minneapolis MN 55414 / US | |||
12 /
STRUPP, John 12767 Northwest Ibis Street Coon Rapids MN 55448 / US | |||
13 /
ANDERSON, Peter M. 2809 Louisiana Avenue St. Louis Park MN 55426 / US | |||
14 /
WU, Xiaoping 1000 Westgate Drive Suite 160 St. Paul MN 55114-8658 / US | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2018/42] |
Former [2014/38] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstraße 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/47] | Curley, Donnacha John, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 07750849.7 | 17.02.2007 | [2008/47] | WO2007US04040 | Priority number, date | US20060774297P | 17.02.2006 Original published format: US 774297 P | [2008/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007098011 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1991887 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1991887 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/561, G01R33/565, G01R33/24, G01R33/58, G01R33/54, // G01R33/341, G01R33/343 | [2018/18] | CPC: |
G01R33/583 (EP,US);
G01R33/246 (EP,US);
G01R33/543 (US);
G01R33/546 (US);
G01R33/5612 (EP,US);
G01R33/5659 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/47] | G01V3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/42] |
Former [2008/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHFELD-MAGNETRESONANZ | [2008/47] | English: | HIGH FIELD MAGNETIC RESONANCE | [2008/47] | French: | RÉSONANCE MAGNÉTIQUE DE HAUTE RÉSOLUTION | [2008/47] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 14.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14002914.1 / EP2899561 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.02.2007 | AT | 17.10.2018 | CY | 17.10.2018 | CZ | 17.10.2018 | DK | 17.10.2018 | EE | 17.10.2018 | ES | 17.10.2018 | FI | 17.10.2018 | IT | 17.10.2018 | LT | 17.10.2018 | LV | 17.10.2018 | MC | 17.10.2018 | NL | 17.10.2018 | PL | 17.10.2018 | RO | 17.10.2018 | SE | 17.10.2018 | SI | 17.10.2018 | SK | 17.10.2018 | TR | 17.10.2018 | BG | 17.01.2019 | GR | 18.01.2019 | IE | 17.02.2019 | IS | 17.02.2019 | LU | 17.02.2019 | PT | 17.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | [2021/33] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CY | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IE | 17.02.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
LU | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IE | 17.02.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
LU | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IE | 17.02.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
LU | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IE | 17.02.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
LU | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
LU | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
LU | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
LU | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 17.10.2018 | |
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 17.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003184293 (BOSKAMP EDDY BENJAMIN [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1,4,5 *; | [X]WO2005034141 (UNIV MINNESOTA [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 4, line 1 - page 8, line 12; figures 1-4 * * page 10, line 12 - page 13, line 26 * * page 16 - page 17 *; | [X]WO2005050239 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 4, line 21 - page 8, line 22; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2005242816 (KURPAD KRISHNA N [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0082]; figures 1,2 *; | [X] - KATSCHER U ET AL, "Static and Dynamic RF-shimming in the framework of Transmit SENSE", INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE. SCIENTIFIC MEETING AND EXHIBITION. PROCEEDINGS, INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, US, (20050101), ISSN 1524-6965, page 2256, XP002440405 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5311132 (NOLL DOUGLAS C [US], et al); | [Y]US5614827 (HEID OLIVER [CH]); | [Y]US6696838 (RAFTERY DANIEL [US], et al); | [X]US6977502 (HERTZ DAVID [US]) | Examination | - W A Grissom ET AL, "An Image Domain Approach for the Design of RF Pulses in Transmit SENSE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, 13TH ANNUAL MEETING AND EXHIBITION, MIAMI BEACH, FLORIDA, USA, 7-13 MAY 2005, (20050423), page 19, XP055029625 |