Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1996342
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
06.07.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] |
06.07.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] |
30.03.2012 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.03.2012 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
23.09.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.09.2011 |
First examination report |
|
18.02.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.11.2010 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] |
26.11.2010 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] |
20.02.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.03.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.11.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
12.11.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] |
12.11.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] |
18.10.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.10.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.09.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|