EP1993344 - FLEXIBLE CUTTING PLATFORM TO FOLLOW GROUND CONTOUR IN AN AGRICULTURAL HARVESTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [2017/24] |
Former [2008/48] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COERS, Bruce, Alan 5016 290th Street North Hillsdale, IL 61257 / US | 02 /
JENSEN, Roderick, James 980 North Shore Drive Moline, IL 61265 / US | 03 /
CHANEY, Mark, Michael 17 Mary Lane Court Geneseo, IL 61254 / US | 04 /
WATTS, Bradley, James 613 Fox Ridge Road Eldridge, IA 52748 / US | [2008/48] | Representative(s) | Holst, Sönke John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2017/24] |
Former [2008/48] | Holst, Sönke Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 07751206.9 | 21.02.2007 | [2008/48] | WO2007US04432 | Priority number, date | US20060366035 | 02.03.2006 Original published format: US 366035 | [2008/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007106299 | Date: | 20.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1993344 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1993344 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01D75/28, A01D41/14, A01D61/00 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
A01D41/14 (EP,US);
A01D61/002 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/48] | A01D75/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/24] |
Former [2008/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLEXIBLE SCHNEIDEPLATTFORM ZUR VERFOLGUNG EINER GRUNDKONTUR IN EINER LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHEN ERNTEMASCHINE | [2008/48] | English: | FLEXIBLE CUTTING PLATFORM TO FOLLOW GROUND CONTOUR IN AN AGRICULTURAL HARVESTING MACHINE | [2008/48] | French: | PLATE-FORME DE COUPE SOUPLE SUIVANT LE CONTOUR DU SOL DANS UNE MOISSONNEUSE AGRICOLE | [2008/48] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 08.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.02.2007 | AT | 14.06.2017 | CY | 14.06.2017 | CZ | 14.06.2017 | DK | 14.06.2017 | EE | 14.06.2017 | ES | 14.06.2017 | FI | 14.06.2017 | LT | 14.06.2017 | LV | 14.06.2017 | MC | 14.06.2017 | NL | 14.06.2017 | PL | 14.06.2017 | PT | 14.06.2017 | RO | 14.06.2017 | SE | 14.06.2017 | SI | 14.06.2017 | SK | 14.06.2017 | TR | 14.06.2017 | BG | 14.09.2017 | GR | 15.09.2017 | IS | 14.10.2017 | GB | 21.02.2018 | IE | 21.02.2018 | LU | 21.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 21.02.2007 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PT | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
GB | 21.02.2018 | ||
IE | 21.02.2018 | ||
LU | 21.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
GB | 21.02.2018 | ||
IE | 21.02.2018 | ||
LU | 21.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
GB | 21.02.2018 | ||
IE | 21.02.2018 | ||
LU | 21.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 21.02.2018 | ||
LU | 21.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
LU | 21.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 14.06.2017 | |
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | ES | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CA2307176 (MACDON IND LTD [CA]) [A] 1-15 * page 12, line 11 - page 16, line 20 * * figures 1,3,5 *; | [A]WO02102138 (MACDON IND LTD [CA]) [A] 1-15 * page 14 - page 17 * * figures 1-6 * | International search | [X]US5005343 (PATTERSON ROGER L [CA]); | [Y]US5459986 (TALBOT FRANCOIS [CA], et al); | [Y]US4938010 (GUINN RONALD K [US], et al) | by applicant | US6202397 | CA2307176 | WO02102138 |