EP1993530 - USE OF DHA AND ARA IN THE PREPARATION OF A COMPOSITION FOR REGULATING GENE EXPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mead Johnson Nutrition Company 2400 West Lloyd Expressway Evansville, IN 47721-0001 / US | For all designated states Cornell Research Foundation, Inc. 20 Thornwood Drive, Suite 105 Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | [2009/36] |
Former [2008/48] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Lawrenceville-Princeton Road Princeton NJ 08543-4000 / US | ||
For all designated states Cornell Research Foundation, Inc. 20 Thornwood Drive, Suite 105 Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOUNI, Zeina Bristol-myers Squibb Company - Mead Johnson 2400 West Lloyd Expressway Evansville, IN 47721 / US | 02 /
BRENNA, J., Thomas 32 Deerhaven Drive Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | 03 /
ANTHONY, Joshua, C. Bristol-myers Squibb Company - Mead Johnson 2400 West Lloyd Expressway Evansville, IN 47721 / US | 04 /
KOTHAPALLI, Kumar Sesha Durga 201 Maple Avenue Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | 05 /
RUMSEY, Steven, C. Rua Pasteur, 260 Apt. 401 Curitiba, PR / BR | 06 /
RAI, Deshanie Bristol-myers Squibb Company - Mead Johnson 2400 West Lloyd Expressway Evansville, IN 47721 / US | [2008/48] | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2009/36] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/48] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07751225.9 | 21.02.2007 | [2008/48] | WO2007US04451 | Priority number, date | US20060777724P | 28.02.2006 Original published format: US 777724 P | [2008/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007100566 | Date: | 07.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1993530 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/202, A61P3/06, A61P9/00, A61P11/00, A61P25/28, A61P27/02, A61P37/02, A61P35/00, A61P3/10 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
A61K31/202 (EP,KR,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON DHA UND ARA BEI DER HERSTELLUNG EINER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR REGULIERUNG DER GENEXPRESSION | [2008/48] | English: | USE OF DHA AND ARA IN THE PREPARATION OF A COMPOSITION FOR REGULATING GENE EXPRESSION | [2008/48] | French: | UTILISATION DE DHA ET D'ARA DANS LA PRÉPARATION D'UNE COMPOSITION PERMETTANT DE RÉGULER L'EXPRESSION GÉNIQUE | [2008/48] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 04.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO02068687 (GENEMEDIX PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-27,40-52 * figures 1,2; example - *; | [Y]US2005043405 (FRITSCH DALE A [US], et al) [Y] 1-27,40-52 * claim -; tables 6,8 *; | [Y]WO2005037848 (ENZYMOTEC LTD [IL], et al) [Y] 1-27,40-52 * page 40, paragraph 1; claim - *; | [DY] - BERGER ALVIN ET AL, "Dietary effects of arachidonate-rich fungal oil and fish oil on murine hepatic and hippocampal gene expression", LIPIDS IN HEALTH AND DISEASE, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20021021), vol. 1, no. 1, ISSN 1476-511X, page 2, XP021018308 [DY] 1-27,40-52 * Chapter: Gene expression analysis, Conclusions and key findings, Materials;; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1476-511X-1-2 | [PX] - KOTHAPALLI K S D ET AL, "Comprehensive differential transcriptome analysis of cerebral cortex of baboon neonates consuming arachidonic acid and moderate and high docosahexaenoic acid formulas", FASEB JOURNAL, & EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY 2006 MEETING; SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA; APRIL 01 05, 2006, (200603), vol. 20, no. 5, Part 2, ISSN 0892-6638, page A1347, XP002475656 [PX] 1-27,40-52 * the whole document * | [T] - KOTHAPALLI KUMAR S D ET AL, "Differential cerebral cortex transcriptomes of baboon neonates consuming moderate and high docosahexaenoic acid formulas.", PLOS ONE 2007, (2007), vol. 2, no. 4, ISSN 1932-6203, page e370, XP002475657 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0000370 | [Y] - DELLA RAGIONE A F ET AL, "Genes modulated by histone acetylation as new effectors of butyrate activity", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20010622), vol. 499, no. 3, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 199 - 204, XP004247015 [Y] 1-27,40-52 * page 201, column 2, paragraph 2; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(01)02539-X | [X] - TSAI WEN-SY ET AL, "Inhibitory effects of n-3 polyunsaturated fatty acids on sigmoid colon cancer transformants", JOURNAL OF GASTROENTEROLOGY, (199804), vol. 33, no. 2, ISSN 0944-1174, pages 206 - 212, XP002475658 [X] 1-27,40-52 * abstract * | [X] - MENENDEZ JAVIER A ET AL, "Overexpression and hyperactivity of breast cancer-associated fatty acid synthase (oncogenic antigen-519) is insensitive to normal arachidonic fatty acid-induced suppression in lipogenic tissues but it is selectively inhibited by tumoricidal alpha-linolenic and gamma-linolenic fatty acids: A novel me", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ONCOLOGY, (200406), vol. 24, no. 6, ISSN 1019-6439, pages 1369 - 1383, XP009097853 [X] 1-27,40-52 * abstract * | [DY] - YOSHIDA YUTAKA ET AL, "Mice lacking a transcriptional corepressor Tob are predisposed to cancer.", GENES AND DEVELOPMENT, (20030515), vol. 17, no. 10, ISSN 0890-9369, pages 1201 - 1206, XP002475659 [DY] 1-27,40-52 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gad.1088003 | [X] - BERGER ALVIN ET AL, "Unraveling lipid metabolism with microarrays: effects of arachidonate and docosahexaenoate acid on murine hepatic and hippocampal gene expression.", GENOME BIOLOGY 23 MAY 2002, (20020523), vol. 3, no. 7, ISSN 1465-6914, page PREPRINT0004, XP009097855 [X] 1-27,40-52 * the whole document * | [Y] - INNIS SHELA M, "Perinatal biochemistry and physiology of long-chain polyunsaturated fatty acids.", JOURNAL OF PEDIATRICS, (200310), vol. 143, no. 4 Supplement, ISSN 0022-3476, pages S1 - S8, XP009097749 [Y] 1-27,40-52 * page S1, paragraph 1 - page S2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1067/S0022-3476(03)00396-2 | [Y] - WAINWRIGHT P E ET AL, "ARACHIDONIC ACID OFFSETS THE EFFECTS ON MOUSE BRAIN AND BEHAVIOR OF A DIET WITH A LOW (N-6):(N-3) RATIO AND VERY HIGH LEVELS OF DOCOSAHEXAENOIC ACID", JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, WISTAR INSTITUTE OF ANATOMY AND BIOLOGY, PHILADELPHIA, PA,, US, (1997), vol. 127, ISSN 0022-3166, pages 184 - 193, XP002950179 [Y] 1-27,40-52 * page 192, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 2; figures 3,4 * | [DY] - JIN M ET AL, "The negative cell cycle regulator, Tob (transducer of ErbB-2), is a multifunctional protein involved in hippocampus-dependent learning and memory", NEUROSCIENCE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (2005), vol. 131, no. 3, ISSN 0306-4522, pages 647 - 659, XP004760726 [DY] 1-27,40-52 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neuroscience.2004.10.044 | [DXP] - KOTANI ET AL, "Dietary supplementation of arachidonic and docosahexaenoic acids improves cognitive dysfunction", NEUROSCIENCE RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, SHANNON, IR, (200610), vol. 56, no. 2, ISSN 0168-0102, pages 159 - 164, XP005657071 [DXP] 1-27,40-52 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neures.2006.06.010 | [Y] - YAQOOB P, "Lipids and the immune response: From molecular mechanisms to clinical applications", CURRENT OPINION IN CLINICAL NUTRITION AND METABOLIC CARE 200303 US, (200303), vol. 6, no. 2, ISSN 1363-1950, pages 133 - 150, XP009097854 [Y] 1-27,40-52 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00075197-200303000-00002 | [DY] - GEBAUER MATHIAS ET AL, "Repression of anti-proliferative factor Tob1 in osteoarthritic cartilage", ARTHRITIS RESEARCH, CURRENT SCIENCE, LONDON,, GB, (20050111), vol. 7, no. 2, ISSN 1465-9905, pages R274 - R284, XP021011562 [DY] 1-27,40-52 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/ar1479 |