EP1994482 - VIRTUAL HEART VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Edwards Lifesciences Corporation One Edwards Way Irvine, CA 92614 / US | [2008/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAO, Henchu 22 Sweet Bay Irvine, CA 92603 / US | 02 /
SUN, Wei 1 Brookfield Irvine, CA 92604 / US | [2008/48] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/48] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07752180.5 | 01.03.2007 | [2008/48] | WO2007US05463 | Priority number, date | US20060778322P | 02.03.2006 Original published format: US 778322 P | US20070680519 | 28.02.2007 Original published format: US 680519 | [2008/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007103229 | Date: | 13.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1994482 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1994482 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/50, A61F2/24, F16K15/14 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
A61F2/2418 (EP,US);
A61F2/2412 (EP,US);
G06F30/23 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0075 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0054 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/39] |
Former [2008/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VIRTUELLE HERZKLAPPE | [2008/48] | English: | VIRTUAL HEART VALVE | [2008/48] | French: | VALVE DE COEUR VIRTUELLE | [2008/48] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 09.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.03.2007 | AT | 27.02.2013 | BE | 27.02.2013 | CY | 27.02.2013 | CZ | 27.02.2013 | DK | 27.02.2013 | EE | 27.02.2013 | FI | 27.02.2013 | IT | 27.02.2013 | LT | 27.02.2013 | LV | 27.02.2013 | MT | 27.02.2013 | NL | 27.02.2013 | PL | 27.02.2013 | RO | 27.02.2013 | SE | 27.02.2013 | SI | 27.02.2013 | SK | 27.02.2013 | TR | 27.02.2013 | IE | 01.03.2013 | LU | 01.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | BG | 27.05.2013 | GR | 28.05.2013 | ES | 07.06.2013 | IS | 27.06.2013 | PT | 27.06.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
IT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MT | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
TR | 27.02.2013 | ||
IE | 01.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
IT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MT | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
IE | 01.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
IT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
IE | 01.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
IT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
IE | 01.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
IT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 27.02.2013 | |
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 27.02.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US6328763 (LOVE JACK W [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 5, paragraph LAST * * column 6, paragraph 1 * [A] 3-7 [Y] 2; | [X]WO02100301 (AORTECH EUROP LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * page 29, paragraphs 2,3 *; | [Y]US4731074 (ROUSSEAU EDUARD P M [NL], et al) [Y] 2 * column 3; figures 1-3 * |