EP2001551 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TREATMENT OF EATING DISORDERS BY MEANS OF NEURO-ELECTRICAL CODED SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neurosignal Technologies, Inc 539 Oliver Ross Drive NW Albuquerque NM 87121 / US | [2008/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STONE, Robert, T. 869 Cumberland Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 02 /
FRANCIS, Ralph, C. 5958 Almaden Lane Oakland, CA 94611 / US | [2008/51] | Representative(s) | Charlton, Peter John Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/51] | Charlton, Peter John Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 07752574.9 | 06.03.2007 | [2008/51] | WO2007US05885 | Priority number, date | US20060393194 | 29.03.2006 Original published format: US 393194 | [2008/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007126555 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2001551 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/04 | [2008/51] | CPC: |
A61N1/36085 (EP,US);
A61N1/36153 (EP,US);
A61N1/36007 (EP,US);
A61N1/36167 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ESSSTÖRUNGEN MITTELS NEUROELEKTRISCHER KODIERTER SIGNALE | [2008/51] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TREATMENT OF EATING DISORDERS BY MEANS OF NEURO-ELECTRICAL CODED SIGNALS | [2008/51] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR UN TRAITEMENT DES TROUBLES DU COMPORTEMENT ALIMENTAIRE AU MOYEN DE SIGNAUX CODES NEURO-ELECTRIQUES | [2008/51] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 10.02.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5263480 (WERNICKE JOACHIM F [US], et al); | [Y]US2005137644 (BOVEJA BIRINDER R [US], et al); | [Y]US6587719 (BARRETT BURKE [US], et al); | [Y]US2005131485 (KNUDSON MARK B [US], et al) |